Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:23-bk-10559
Case Filed:May 02, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Friday, June 02, 2023
199 199 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:40 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Approving Notification and Hearing Procedures for Certain Transfers of Common Stock and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Slater, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 9 ,67
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
198 198 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Taxes and Fees and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Slater, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 8 ,66
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
197 197 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Management System, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, (C) Maintain Existing Business Forms, and (D) Perform Intercompany Transactions and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 12 ,60
196 196 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:31 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services, (II) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Procedures for Resolving Adequate Assurance Requests, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Slater, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 5 ,63
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
195 195 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:27 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation and Reimbursable Expenses and (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Slater, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 19 ,58
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
194 194 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:25 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain Insurance Coverage and Surety Coverage Entered Into Prepetition and Pay Related Prepetition Obligations and (B) Renew, Supplement, Modify, or Purchase Insurance and Surety Coverage and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 7 ,65
193 193 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:22 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain and Administer Their Customer Programs and (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 10
192 192 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 06/02 11:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Payment of All Accounts Payable Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business, (II) Granting Administrative Expense Priority to Undisputed Obligations on Account of Outstanding Orders, (III) Authorizing Satisfaction of Obligations Related Thereto, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 4
191 191 court Standing Order/Transcripts Fri 06/02 5:03 PM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable Companies . Telephone number 302-654-8080 .. Related [+]
Related: [-] liable Companies
190 190 court Minute Entry Fri 06/02 4:54 PM
Minute Entry Re: Related [+] Appearances: See attached registration report.
Related: [-] 167 Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing: Status Conference, Presented to Judge preview of upcoming hearing. (HEARING RESCHEDULED) Hearing Held on 6/2/23 - Notice filed by Lannett Company, Inc.167 (ALD
189 189 misc Reservation of Rights Fri 06/02 4:00 PM
Reservation of Rights //Securities Plaintiffs' Reservation of Rights with Respect to the Debtors' Disclosure Statement and Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Related [+] Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 16 ,17
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
188 188 misc Exhibit Fri 06/02 3:22 PM
Exhibit(s) //Notice of Securities Plaintiffs' Opt-Out Form Submission Related [+] Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 173 ,184
Att: 1 Exhibit A
187 187 audio Fri 06/02 3:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [06/02/2023 02:58:55 PM]. File Size [ 5457 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:24 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
186 186 motion Shorten - Motion Fri 06/02 12:12 PM
Motion to Shorten Notice With Respect to Motion Of Debtors For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To File Under Seal The New RCF Fee Letter Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 183
Att: 1 Exhibit A-proposed Order
185 185 plan Plan Supplement Fri 06/02 11:27 AM
[SEALED] Plan Supplement (Notice of Filing of First Supplemental Plan Supplement) Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 183
184 184 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/02 8:38 AM
Agreed Order Approving Stipulation Authorizing Securities Plaintiffs to Opt Out of Third-Party Release on Behalf of the Certified Class Related [+] Order Signed on 6/2/2023. (AJL)
Related: [-] 173
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
183 183 motion File Under Seal - Motion (B) Fri 06/02 1:27 AM
Motion to File Under Seal / Motion Of Debtors For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To File Under Seal The New RCF Fee Letter [Related Doc No. 182] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
182 182 plan Plan Supplement Fri 06/02 1:04 AM
Plan Supplement /Notice of Filing of First Supplemental Plan Supplement Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] dacted16 ,119
Thursday, June 01, 2023
181 181 motion Authorize - Motion Thu 06/01 10:49 PM
Motion to Authorize / Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Compensate Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/15/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice
180 180 motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Thu 06/01 10:39 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Guggenheim Securities, LLC as Investment Banker Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/15/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
179 179 motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Thu 06/01 10:35 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP as Tax Restructuring Services Provider Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/15/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
178 178 motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Thu 06/01 10:31 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/15/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Notice
177 177 motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Thu 06/01 10:26 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain FTI Consulting, Inc. as Financial Advisor Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/15/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
176 176 motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Thu 06/01 10:21 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Fox Rothschild LLP as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/15/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Notice
175 175 plan Objection to Confirmation of Plan Thu 06/01 5:13 PM
Limited Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Securities And Exchange Commission Related [+]. (Schrage, Patricia)
Related: [-] 16
174 174 answer Objection Thu 06/01 4:49 PM
Objection of 1199SEIU Benefit Funds, DC47 Fund and SBA Fund to the Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Lannett Company, Inc. and its Debtor Affiliates Related [+] Filed by 1199SEIU Benefit Funds, DC47 Fund and SBA Fund (SPOLTORE, LESLIE)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
173 173 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 06/01 3:32 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation and Agreed Order Authorizing Securities Plaintiffs to Opt Out of Third-Party Release on Behalf of the Certified Class Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
172 172 plan Objection to Confirmation of Plan Thu 06/01 1:39 PM
Limited Objection to Confirmation of Plan Related [+] Filed by Veranova, L.P. (Murley, Lucian)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
171 171 answer Objection Thu 06/01 12:31 PM
Limited Objection to Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, (B) File a Consolidated List of the Debtors' 30 Largest Creditors, and (C) Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information, (II) Waiving the Requirement to File a List of Equity Security Holders, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by U.S. Trustee (Cudia, Joseph)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Transcript Excerpt
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
170 170 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 06/01 12:14 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Service of the Debtors Request for Production of Documents to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors [Docket No. 151], Notice of Service of the Debtors Request for Production of Documents to the United States Trustee for the District of Delaware [Docket No. 152], Debtors Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of the United States Trustee for the District of Delaware [Docket No. 153], Debtors Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Veranova, L.P. [Docket No. 154], Debtors Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Computershare Trust Company, N.A. [Docket No. 155], and Debtors Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cediprof, Inc. [Docket No. 156] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 151 ,152 ,153 ,154 ,155 ,156
169 169 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 06/01 12:12 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Contested Scheduling Order and Request for Hearing on Discovery Disputes with Respect to Emergency Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Seeking to (A) Disband the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, or, in the Alternative, (B) Hold the Actions of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Abeyance for Seventy-Five Days After the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 143] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 143
168 168 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 06/01 12:10 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Filing of Plan Supplement [Docket No. 119] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 119
167 167 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING RESCHEDULED) - Notice Thu 06/01 8:55 AM
HEARING RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Hearing Originally Scheduled for June 1, 2023 rescheduled to June 2, 2023 at 3:00 P.M. has been rescheduled. Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Objections due by 6/1/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
166 166 notice Notice of Service Thu 06/01 8:54 AM
Notice of Service Regarding Crossover Groups Responses and Objections to the Committees Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to the Crossover Group in Connection with the Debtors Motion to Disband the Committee Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
165 165 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 05/31 3:53 PM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Emergency Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Reconsideration of Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation Hearing, (II) Approving Related Dates, Deadlines, Notices, and Procedures, (III) Approving the Solicitation Procedures and Related Dates, Deadlines, and Notices, and (IV) Conditionally Waiving the Requirements that (A) the U.S. Trustee Convene a Meeting of Creditors and (B) the Debtors File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 6/1/2023 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/1/2023. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 122 ,123 ,157
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
164 164 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Wed 05/31 2:42 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/1/2023 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
163 163 misc Letter (Bk) Wed 05/31 2:20 PM
Letter to The Honorable J. Kate Stickles re Discovery Dispute Related [+] Filed by Computershare Trust Company, National Association. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-] 98
162 162 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Wed 05/31 1:22 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/1/2023 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
161 161 misc Letter (Bk) Wed 05/31 12:29 PM
Letter to the Honorable J. Kate Stickles Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3
Att: 4 Exhibit B-1
Att: 5 Exhibit B-2
Att: 6 Exhibit B-3
Att: 7 Exhibit C-1
Att: 8 Exhibit C-2
Att: 9 Exhibit D
Att: 10 Exhibit E
Att: 11 Exhibit F
Att: 12 Exhibit G-1
Att: 13 Exhibit G-2
Att: 14 Exhibit H
Att: 15 Exhibit I
160 160 misc Letter (Bk) Wed 05/31 11:54 AM
Letter to the Honorable J. Kate Stickles (from the Debtors and the Crossover Group) Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
159 159 misc Letter (Bk) Wed 05/31 11:43 AM
Letter Motion to Quash Notices of Deposition and Requests for Production of Documents Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Cudia, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
158 158 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/30 3:15 PM
Notice of Appearance.. Filed by AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Wesco Insurance Company. (Hochheiser, Alan)
Related: [-]
157 157 order Shorten Time Tue 05/30 2:31 PM
Order Shortening Notice Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Motion To Extend Confirmation Hearing. Related [+] Order Signed on 5/30/2023. (AJL)
Related: [-] 123 123
156 156 notice Deposition - Notice Tue 05/30 12:53 PM
Notice of Deposition /Debtors' Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cediprof, Inc. Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
155 155 notice Deposition - Notice Tue 05/30 12:51 PM
Notice of Deposition /Debtors' Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Computershare Trust Company, N.A. Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
154 154 notice Notice of Service Tue 05/30 12:48 PM
Notice of Service of Debtor's Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Veranova, L.P. Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
153 153 notice Notice of Service Tue 05/30 12:46 PM
Notice of Service of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of the United States Trustee for the District of Delaware Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
152 152 notice Notice of Service Tue 05/30 12:44 PM
Notice of Service of the Debtors' Request for Production of Documents to the United States Trustee for the District of Delaware Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
151 151 notice Notice of Service Tue 05/30 12:41 PM
Notice of Service of the Debtors' Request for Production of Documents to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
150 150 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/30 11:19 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Lindsay H. Sklar Related [+] Order Signed on 5/30/2023. (PS)
Related: [-] 147
149 149 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/30 11:17 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Andrew Behlmann Related [+] Order Signed on 5/30/2023. (PS)
Related: [-] 146 146
148 148 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/30 11:16 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Michael S. Etkin Related [+] Order Signed on 5/30/2023. (PS)
Related: [-] 145
147 147 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/30 10:20 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Lindsay H. Sklar . Receipt Number 4058167, Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
146 146 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/30 10:18 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew Behlmann, Esq. . Receipt Number 4058167, Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
145 145 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/30 10:14 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael S. Etkin, Esq. . Receipt Number 4058167, Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
144 144 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/30 10:10 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
143 143 notice Notice of Service Tue 05/30 8:33 AM
Notice of Service (Notice of Contested Scheduling Order and Request for Hearing on Discovery Disputes with Respect to Emergency Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Seeking to (A) Disband the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, or, in the Alternative, (B) Hold the Actions of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Abeyance for Seventy-Five Days After the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief ) Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 98 ,99 ,100 ,102 ,103 ,109
misc Add Attorney Tue 05/30 10:11 AM
Attorney Michael Seth Etkin and Christopher Page Simon for Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds and University of Puerto Rico Retirement System, Andrew Behlmann and Christopher Page Simon for Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds and University of Puerto Rico Retirement System, Lindsay Sklar and Christopher Page Simon for Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds and University of Puerto Rico Retirement System added to case Filed by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361, and 417 Union Security Funds, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 28, 2023
142 142 notice Notice of Service Sun 05/28 10:59 PM
Notice of Service of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to the Debtors in Connection with the Debtors' Motion to Disband the Committee Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-]
141 141 notice Notice of Service Sun 05/28 10:57 PM
Notice of Service of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to the Crossover Group in Connection with the Debtors' Motion to Disband the Committee Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-]
140 140 notice Notice of Service Sun 05/28 10:54 PM
Notice of Service of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Notice of Reservation of Rights to Depose: Members of the Crossover Group; the Debtors and the Witnesses to be Identified in Connection with the Hearing on the Debtors' Motion to Disband Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-]
139 139 notice Deposition - Notice Sun 05/28 8:58 PM
Notice of Deposition // Crossover Group's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of the United States Trustee for the District of Delaware Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
138 138 notice Deposition - Notice Sun 05/28 8:56 PM
Notice of Deposition // Crossover Group's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Cediprof, Inc. Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
137 137 notice Deposition - Notice Sun 05/28 8:54 PM
Notice of Deposition // Crossover Group's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Veranova, L.P. Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
136 136 notice Deposition - Notice Sun 05/28 8:51 PM
Notice of Deposition // Crossover Group's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Computershare Trust Company, N.A. Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
135 135 notice Notice of Service Sun 05/28 7:51 PM
Notice of Service Regarding Crossover Group's Request for Production of Documents to the United States Trustee for the District of Delaware Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
134 134 notice Notice of Service Sun 05/28 7:49 PM
Notice of Service Regarding Crossover Group's Request for Production of Documents to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 27, 2023
133 133 misc Joinder (Attorney) Sat 05/27 3:28 PM
Joinder of Crossover Group to Debtors' Objection to Motion for Order Shortening Notice Related [+] Filed by Crossover Group. (McNeill, R.)
Related: [-] 123 ,132
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
132 132 answer Objection Sat 05/27 1:32 PM
Objection to Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Shorten Notice of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Emergency Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Reconsideration of Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation Hearing, (II) Approving Related Dates, Deadlines, Notices, and Procedures, (III) Approving the Solicitation Procedures and Related Dates, Deadlines, and Notices, and (IV) Conditionally Waiving the Requirements that (A) the U.S. Trustee Convene a Meeting of Creditors and (B) the Debtors File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 123
131 131 notice Hearing - Notice Sat 05/27 10:45 AM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Emergency Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Seeking to (I)(A) Disband the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, or in the Alternative, (B) Hold the Actions of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Abeyance of Seventy-Five Days After the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Lannett Company, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/8/2023 at 02:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/3/2023. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 98 ,99
Friday, May 26, 2023
130 130 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 3:58 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of William Alemany-Mendez Related [+] Order Signed on 5/26/2023.(PS)
Related: [-] 127
129 129 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 3:56 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Luisa S. Valle Castro Related [+] Order Signed on 5/26/2023. (PS)
Related: [-] 126 126
128 128 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 3:55 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Carmen D. Conde Torres Related [+] Order Signed on 5/26/2023. (PS)
Related: [-] 125 125
127 127 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 05/26 3:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for William Alemany-Mendez, Esq. . Receipt Number 4145785, Filed by Cediprof, Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
126 126 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 05/26 3:28 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Luisa S. Valle Castro, Esq . Receipt Number 4145785, Filed by Cediprof, Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
125 125 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 05/26 3:26 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Carmen D. Conde Torres, Esq. . Receipt Number 4145785, Filed by Cediprof, Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
124 124 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 05/26 3:20 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Cediprof, Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
123 123 8 pgs motion Shorten - Motion Fri 05/26 2:13 PM
Motion to Shorten // Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Shorten Notice of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Emergency Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Reconsideration of Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation Hearing, (II) Approving Related Dates, Deadlines, Notices, and Procedures, (III) Approving the Solicitation Procedures and Related Dates, Deadlines, and Notices, and (IV) Conditionally Waiving the Requirements that (A) the U.S. Trustee Convene a Meeting of Creditors and (B) the Debtors File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 122
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
122 122 motion Reconsider - Motion Fri 05/26 2:03 PM
Emergency Motion to Reconsider // Emergency Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Reconsideration of Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation Hearing, (II) Approving Related Dates, Deadlines, Notices, and Procedures, (III) Approving the Solicitation Procedures and Related Dates, Deadlines, and Notices, and (IV) Conditionally Waiving the Requirements that (A) the U.S. Trustee Convene a Meeting of Creditors and (B) the Debtors File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 18 ,59
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
121 121 misc Transcript Fri 05/26 10:32 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/24/2023 RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/24/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number (302)654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/2/2023. Redaction Request Due By 6/16/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/26/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/24/2023. (BJM)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Fri 05/26 3:24 PM
Attorney Carmen D. Conde Torres and David M. Klauder for Cediprof, Inc., Luisa S. Valle Castro and David M. Klauder for Cediprof, Inc., William Alemay-Mendez and David M. Klauder for Cediprof, Inc. added to case Filed by Cediprof, Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]