Oakrum Pharma, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-10605
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-10605
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10608 |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Oakrum Pharma, LLC
3636 S. Geyser Rd. Suite 100
St. Louis, MO 63127 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
court
SBRA-Trustee Discharged
Tue 04/16 11:39 AM
It appearing to the Court that the Trustee has filed his final report and that said Trustee has performed all other and further duties required in the administration of this estate; IT IS ORDERED that the report is approved and the Trustee is discharged as trustee of this estate. (SJM) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
trustee
SBRA-Case Trustee's Report of No Distribution D- consensual plan consummated, fee award recd
Fri 03/15 10:02 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution(D). Funds Collected: $0.00. Fees Awarded: $25,255.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 10 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $3106594.52, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $16112664.26, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $16112664.26. Filed by David M. Klauder. Tickle due by: 4/15/2024. (Klauder, David) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/05 12:22 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Oakrum Pharma, LLC. (Sarna, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/05 12:20 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Oakrum Pharma, LLC. (Sarna, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 05/18 11:37 AM
Order Authorizing (1) The Joint Administration Of The Debtor's Subchapter V Cases And (II) Granting Related Relief "An Order has been entered in this case directing the proceduralconsolidation and joint administration of the subchapter V cases of Vyera Pharmaceuticals, LLC (1758); Oakrum Pharma, LLC (3999); SevenScore Pharmaceuticals, LLC (2598); Phoenixus AG (1091); Dermelix Biotherapeutics, LLC (4711); and Orpha Labs AG. The Debtors headquarters and the mailing address for the Debtors is 600 3rd Avenue, 19th Floor, New York, NY 10016. The docket in the subchapter V case of Vyera Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Case No. 23-10605 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Alternatively, information concerning these jointly administered subchapter V cases may be obtained by visiting the website of the Debtors claims and noticing agent: http://dm.epiq11.com/Vyera." Signed on 5/18/2023 (AJL) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Thu 05/18 9:26 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Dermelix Biotherapeutics, LLC, Oakrum Pharma, LLC, Orpha Labs AG, Phoenixus AG, SevenScore Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Sarna, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Wed 05/10 8:24 AM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SJS) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 05/09 11:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-10608 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11086414, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 05/09 10:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Oakrum Pharma, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 08/7/2023. (Martin, R.) |