Ward et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01953 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-03345 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 6:34 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Kidde Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Miranda Page
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Everett Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Laporte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly McBride
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Plumber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Newsome Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur O'Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Orr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marsha Parish
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoriano Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Spalo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Winston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Peredo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Armstron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geraldine Austin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Beasley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delvan Blythe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Boren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Brisco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Burchett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Burden Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morris Charles Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cinda Compton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Justice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Engle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Fenoglia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry A. Gary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Green
Georgetown County Detention Center 2394 Browns Ferry Road
Georgetown, SC 29440 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Guillory Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Hickman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Hopkins Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheldon Jefferson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/19 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Strait, Lorenzo Torres, Laura Watson, Ronald Ackley, Shelton Bobo, Randy Cohn, Eleanor Hoff-Moreno, Russell Hunt, Wayne Jakubczak, Tony McGann, Maurice Burden Sr, Glenn Guillory Sr, Marsha Parish, Eddie Peredo, MC Brown, David Burkhardt, Freddie Byrd, Bruce Edwards, Frederick Falco, Kevin Hauck, El Henry, Kimberly Middleton, Rosilyn Wilson, Melvin Andrews, Villareal Baldomero, James Beck, Anthony Benedetti, Dale Brandon, Arthur Burrola, Michael Cromer, Lance Elliot, Daniel Grigsby, Gary Harper, J.E. Honeycutt, Grote James, Kirk Kent, Dennis Littell, Peter O'Sullivan, Dennis Raquet, John Rhyne, Robert Rutherford, Jonathan C Schwarz, Wilhem Shield, John Smith, Mark Stephenson, Philip Thomas, James Wagenbrenner, Edward Waido, Gary Wood, Dennis Youngkin Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bruce Kelly without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Kelly, Bruce J; Riley, Michael; Rollings, Paul; Rundell, Edward; Wilson, Paul; Clark, Alan D.; Fernandez, Anthony; Gonzales, Manuel; Hayes, Anthony; Jackson, Claudette; Spikes, Angela; Lucas, Gary; Nogueira, John; Willette, Charles; Austin, Geraldine; Boren, Joel; Burchett, Frederick E.; Fenoglia, Timothy; Gonzales, Samuel; Hopkins Sr, Barry; Jefferson, Sheldon; Nelson, Phillip; Newsome Jr, William; Perez, Victoriano; Young, IssacAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01444-RMG, 2:23-cv-01445-RMG, 2:23-cv-01952-RMG, 2:23-cv-01953-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/10/2023), 1:23-cv-03345, Ward et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01953-RMG (sshe, ) | |
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 05/11 10:57 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-03345. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/11 11:15 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/10/2023), 1:23-cv-03345, Ward et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01953-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/4/2023) (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal on May 3, 2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal on May 1, 2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of Clayton Armstron, Geraldine Austin, Eric Beasley, Delvan Blythe, Joel Boren, Andrew Brisco, Frederick Burchett, Maurice Burden Sr, Morris Charles Jr, Cinda Compton, Leonard Cooper, Eddie Davis, Gary Engle, Timothy Fenoglia, Larry Gary, Samuel Gonzales, Melvin Green, Glenn Guillory Sr, Oscar Hickman, Barry Hopkins Sr, Sheldon Jefferson, Michael Justice, Mark Laporte, Kimberly McBride, Phillip Nelson, William Newsome Jr, Arthur O'Neal, Mary Orr, Miranda Page, Marsha Parish, Eddie Peredo, Victoriano Perez, Gloria Phillips, Jacqueline Plumber, Everett Smith, James Spalo, Norman Ward, Sharon Winston, Isaac Young..(Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marie E. Napoli on behalf of Clayton Armstron, Geraldine Austin, Eric Beasley, Delvan Blythe, Joel Boren, Andrew Brisco, Frederick Burchett, Maurice Burden Sr, Morris Charles Jr, Cinda Compton, Leonard Cooper, Eddie Davis, Gary Engle, Timothy Fenoglia, Larry Gary, Samuel Gonzales, Melvin Green, Glenn Guillory Sr, Oscar Hickman, Barry Hopkins Sr, Sheldon Jefferson, Michael Justice, Mark Laporte, Kimberly McBride, Phillip Nelson, William Newsome Jr, Arthur O'Neal, Mary Orr, Miranda Page, Marsha Parish, Eddie Peredo, Victoriano Perez, Gloria Phillips, Jacqueline Plumber, Everett Smith, James Spalo, Norman Ward, Sharon Winston, Isaac Young..(Napoli, Marie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER. This case was removed by one Defendant, 3M Company ("3M"), from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on April 20, 2023. Counsel for the Plaintiffs and counsel for all named non-3M Defendants are directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than May 1, 2023. Counsel for Defendant 3M shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for Plaintiffs as well as counsel for all named non-3M Defendants by April 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/25/23) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27636689).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/11/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |