Victor Sosa v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01951 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 6:35 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Sosa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/15 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Sellars, Andrew Rosenthal, Karen Rosenthal, David D'Apolito, Victor Sosa, Clifford Ramsey, Kristina Ramsey, William Schubert, Howard C McClurd, Scott Ludwig, Yasmin Ludwig, Aubrey Mathis, Cora Mathis, Randy Sarlo, Anthony Hayne, Marco Vasquez, Diane Blanco Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pendley, Madeline) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/10/2023), Victor Sosa v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01951-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Jersey (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/11 9:54 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/11 9:55 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/10/2023), Victor Sosa v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01951-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Jersey (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/11 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11094107.), filed by Victor Sosa. Service due by 8/8/2023(sshe, ) |