California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:23-cv-00840
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause09:0009 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:May 11, 2023
Terminated:Jul 07, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 2:46 AM PST
Defendant
Mandeep Kaur Sohi
Petitioner
Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC
Represented By
Tracy L Anielski
Law Office Of Tracy Anielski
contact info
Arturo E Matthews, Jr
Matthews Law Firm Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 02, 2024
33 33 order Withdraw Motion Mon 08/05 1:11 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting31 REQUEST to Withdraw Motion. Re: REQUEST to Withdraw APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Mandeep Kaur Sohi29 31 The Judgment Debtor Examination currently set on August 27, 2024, is hereby taken off-calendar. (kca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
32 32 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 07/30 3:53 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: REQUEST to Withdraw APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Mandeep Kaur Sohi29 31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
31 31 motion Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application Mon 07/29 10:15 AM
REQUEST to Withdraw APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Mandeep Kaur Sohi29 filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. (Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
30 30 order Judgment Debtor Exam Fri 06/21 11:31 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting29 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 8/27/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (kca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
29 29 motion Judgment Debtor Exam Tue 06/18 9:08 AM
APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Mandeep Kaur Sohi filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. Application set for hearing on 8/26/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Anielski, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
28 28 service USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed Wed 01/17 1:44 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) Earning Withholding Order. Served on Robofran Development LLC upon Bianca Trujillo Person apparently in charge on 11/30/23 personal service by CCP. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
27 27 order For Order Thu 10/26 12:15 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting25 REQUEST For Special Appointment to Serve Process. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
25 25 2 pgs motion Order Mon 09/18 10:57 AM
REQUEST for Order for Special Appointment to Serve Process filed by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. (Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR SPECIAL APPOINTMENT TO SERVE PROCESS
Thursday, September 14, 2023
26 26 misc Abstract of Judgment issued Tue 09/19 9:27 AM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC and against Mandeep Kaur Sohi in the principal amount of $ 44,082.04, interest in the amount of $ 3,099.60, attorneys fees of $ 00, costs of $ 3,547.80. RE: Judgment,13 (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
24 24 misc Writ of Execution - Issued Wed 09/06 5:00 PM
Writ of Execution issued against Mandeep Kaur Sohi re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution23 . (twdb)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Wed 09/06 3:10 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: Judgment,,,13 filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC.(Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Writ of Execution
22 22 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Wed 09/06 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: The amount(s) listed in writ/abstract do(es) not coincide with the amount(s) in the judgment/order. (twdb)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Wed 09/06 1:52 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: Judgment,,,13 filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC.(Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Writ of Execution
Thursday, August 31, 2023
20 20 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Thu 08/31 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: The amount(s) listed in writ/abstract do(es) not coincide with the amount(s) in the judgment/order. The attachment/writ is not properly saved as a pdf document. The document is blank. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
19 19 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Wed 08/30 11:54 AM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: Judgment,,,13 filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC.(Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Writ of Execution
18 18 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Wed 08/30 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Writ/abstract must contain the name(s) and address(es) of the judgment debtor. Please use the CV 23 for the Writ. Affidavit and Request CV 24, and CV 23. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
17 17 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Tue 08/29 11:51 AM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: Judgment,,,13 filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC.(Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Writ of Execution
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
16 16 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 07/19 9:41 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document14 , Miscellaneous Document15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Abstract of Judgment should be filed at the clerk's Office. Other error(s) with document(s): Please see Local Rules re Abstract of Judgments. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
15 15 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 07/18 11:37 AM
Writ of Execution filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC (Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 07/18 11:32 AM
Abstract of Judgment filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC (Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
13 13 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 07/07 1:07 PM
JUDGMENT CONFIRMING FOREIGN ARBITRAL AWARD by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Respondent Mandeep Kaur Sohi is ordered to pay to Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC as follows: (a) Respondent shall make payment to Petitioner in the full sum of$44,082.04; (b) Respondent shall pay simple interest on the above sum of$44,082.04 at the rate of 6.11% per annum from May 13, 2022 until date of final payment; (c) In addition, Respondent shall make payment to Claimant of the sum of $3,547.80, in payment of CIArb BAS registration fees incurred by Claimant; and (d) Payments received from Respondent shall first be apportioned to legal costs (CIArb BAS Registration fees), then interest (if any), and finally to the principal amount outstanding 9 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
Related: [-]
12 12 order For Order Leave to Appear Fri 07/07 12:55 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Petitioners Motion for Order Confirming Foreign Arbitral Award [9 U.S.C. § 207] (Dkt. No. 9); (2) VACATING the July 10, 2023 Hearing; and (3) DENYING AS MOOT Petitioners Request to Appear Remotely at Hearing (Dkt. No. 11),9 ,11 . Judgment is entered in favor of Petitioner, as set forth in a separate order. The Clerk is directed to close the case. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Tue 06/27 8:57 AM
REQUEST for Leave of Arturo E. Matthews, Jr. to Appear for Remote Hearing on Motion for Order Confirming Foreign Arbitral Award filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. Request set for hearing on 7/10/2002 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Anielski, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 02, 2023
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 06/02 2:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only7 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Confirming Foreign Arbitral Award 9 and Standing Order served on 6/2/23. (Anielski, Tracy)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs motion Order Fri 06/02 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Confirming Foreign Arbitral Award filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney Tracy L Anielski added to party Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC(pty:pet)) (Anielski, Tracy)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 06/02 2:30 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mandeep Kaur Sohi in compliance with statute not specified by personal service (Anielski, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/25 2:38 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/15 10:15 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Mandeep Kaur Sohi. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 05/15 10:09 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 05/15 10:09 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 05/15 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 05/11 10:01 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. (Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/11 9:51 AM
PETITION to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award Receipt No: ACACDC-35293657 - Fee: $402, filed by Petitioner Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC. (Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party Prodigy Finance CM2021-1 DAC(pty:pet))(Matthews, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 35 pgs Declaration Declaration of Arturo E. Matthews in Support of Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award,
Att: 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment Confirming Foreign Arbitral Award,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet