Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-02267

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:23-ap-00037
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:May 10, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michele Scaglione
24932 Tocaloma Court
Laguna Hills, CA 92653
Represented By
Michele Scaglione
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Atkins
PO Box 875
Pineville, WV 24874
Represented By
Lisa Atkins
contact info
Defendant
David Atkins
PO Box 875
PIneville, WV 24874
Represented By
David Atkins
contact info
Defendant
CJW Holdings, LLC
8545 Commodity Circle Suite 125
Orlando, FL 32819
Represented By
CJW Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Patricia H. Andrews
754 2nd Street
Ayden, NC 28513
Represented By
Patricia H. Andrews
contact info
Defendant
James E. Andrews
754 2nd Street
Ayden, NC 28513
Represented By
James E. Andrews
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger
1340 Brassie Street
Wescoville, PA 18106
Represented By
Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes
602 Fox Den Court
Hendersonville, NC 28792
Represented By
Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb
3925 Calomel Drive
Cummings, GA 30050
Represented By
Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb
contact info
Defendant
EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc.
Officer, Director or Managing Agent PO Box 27083
Tampa, FL 33623
Represented By
EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner
125 Lakeview Lodge Road
Leesville, LA 71446
Represented By
Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner
125 Lakeview Lodge Road
Leesville, LA 71446
Represented By
Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague
100 S Reynolds Street, Apt 418
Alexandria, VA 22304
Represented By
Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague
contact info
Defendant
Ruth R. Little
1083 Allenwood Drive
Plainfield, NJ 07060
Represented By
Ruth R. Little
contact info
Defendant
James A. Little
1083 Allenwood Drive
Plainfield, NJ 07060
Represented By
James A. Little
contact info
Defendant
Nancy Santos
13453 Fauna Lane
Hudson, FL 34669
Represented By
Nancy Santos
contact info
Plaintiff
Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.
475 Broad Creek Road
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Hope Derby Carmichael
Jordan Price Wall Gray Jones & Carlton
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/08 2:21 PM
Adversary Case 5:23-ap-37 Closed (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
18 18 order Default Judgment Wed 07/12 4:29 PM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment. Default Judgment as to EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc., Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger, Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner, Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb, Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes, Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague. Related [+] (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
17 17 court Entry of Default Tue 07/11 12:40 PM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.
Thursday, July 06, 2023
16 16 motion Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application Thu 07/06 2:14 PM
Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc. Related [+]. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-] ument no.15 Motion for Entry of Default, Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, June 30, 2023
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Fri 06/30 12:22 PM
Answer Deadline(s) Terminated/ Expired. Motion for Entry of Default filed. Related [+] (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
15 15 motion Default Judgment Wed 06/28 12:24 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc., Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger, Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner, Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb, Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes, Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague, In Addition To Motion for Default Judgment as to EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc., Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger, Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner, Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb, Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes, Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
14 14 misc Affidavit Mon 06/26 10:44 AM
Affidavit of Service of Process by Publication filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
13 13 order Default Judgment Fri 06/23 3:09 PM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment. Default Judgment as to David Adkins, Lisa Adkins, James E. Andrews, Patricia H. Andrews, CJW Holdings, LLC, James A. Little, Ruth R. Little, Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner, Nanci Santos, Michele Scaglione. Related [+] (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, June 22, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 06/23 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/22/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
11 11 court Entry of Default Tue 06/20 9:14 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 06/13 3:57 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to David Adkins, Lisa Adkins, James E. Andrews, Patricia H. Andrews, CJW Holdings, LLC, James A. Little, Ruth R. Little, Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner, Nanci Santos, Michele Scaglione, In Addition To Motion for Default Judgment as to David Adkins, Lisa Adkins, James E. Andrews, Patricia H. Andrews, CJW Holdings, LLC, James A. Little, Ruth R. Little, Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner, Nanci Santos, Michele Scaglione filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/19 12:18 PM
Amended/Amendment to Summons Service Executed on EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc. 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague 5/12/2023. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/17 1:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc. 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes 5/12/2023; Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague 5/12/2023. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/16 3:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on David Adkins 5/12/2023; Lisa Adkins 5/12/2023; James E. Andrews 5/12/2023; Patricia H. Andrews 5/12/2023; CJW Holdings, LLC 5/12/2023; James A. Little 5/12/2023; Ruth R. Little 5/12/2023; Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner 5/12/2023; Nanci Santos 5/12/2023; Michele Scaglione 5/12/2023. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 05/12 11:16 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin E.F.B. Waller on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Waller, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 05/12 11:16 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] dwine, Rebecca
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 05/12 11:14 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc.. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 05/10 4:28 PM
Summons Issued on EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc. Answer Due 6/22/2023; Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger Answer Due 6/22/2023; Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner Answer Due 6/22/2023; Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb Answer Due 6/22/2023; Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes Answer Due 6/22/2023; Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague Answer Due 6/22/2023. (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 05/10 3:37 PM
Summons Issued on Nancy Santos Answer Due 06/9/2023; James A. Little Answer Due 06/9/2023; Ruth R. Little Answer Due 06/9/2023; Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague Answer Due 06/9/2023; Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner Answer Due 06/9/2023; Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner Answer Due 06/9/2023; EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc. Answer Due 06/9/2023; Michele Scaglione Answer Due 06/9/2023; Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb Answer Due 06/9/2023; Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes Answer Due 06/9/2023; Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger Answer Due 06/9/2023; James E. Andrews Answer Due 06/9/2023; Patricia H. Andrews Answer Due 06/9/2023; CJW Holdings, LLC Answer Due 06/9/2023; David Atkins Answer Due 06/9/2023; Lisa Atkins Answer Due 06/9/2023 (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/10 3:37 PM
Adversary case 23-00037 5. Complaint by Fairfield Harbourside Condominium Association, Inc. against Nancy Santos, James A. Little, Ruth R. Little, Unknown Heirs of Robert R. Montague, Kimberly Sterner Long f/k/a Kimberly D. Sterner, Unknown Heirs of Dale M. Sterner, EZ Timeshare Solutions, Inc., Michele Scaglione, Unknown Heirs of Lyda K. Webb, Unknown Heirs of Marjorie G. Grimes, Unknown Heirs of Allen C. Fanger, James E. Andrews, Patricia H. Andrews, CJW Holdings, LLC, David Atkins, Lisa Atkins (Fee Paid) (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]