Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:23-cv-00355
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 12, 2023 6:18 AM CST
Defendant
G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon, LLP
contact info
John Stuart Collins
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Byerly
Represented By
Alan Clifton Gordon
contact info
Carter T. Hastings
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Lauren E. Braddy
contact info
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/01 9:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bryan Byerly.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 29, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/30 3:43 PM
ORDER SETTING PRIVATE MEDIATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled and numbered case is set for Private Mediation on Friday, February 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Status Conference Tue 01/30 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland: Status Conference held on 1/29/2024. Case called for Status Conference held via Zoom. Parties announced ready. Statements concerning the progress of the cases were made by both Plaintiff and Defense. Private Mediation is set for Friday,February 2, 2024, with Dennis Clifford. Motion to Stay due Monday, February 5, 2024. Status conference will be set if no settlement reached at mediation. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR.)(cav)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/19 2:02 PM
ORDER Setting Zoom Status Conference for 1/29/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
11 11 misc Attachment Tue 08/29 1:14 PM
ATTACHMENT to8 Status Report by Bryan Byerly. (Braddy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
10 10 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 08/28 9:40 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Bryan Byerly. (Braddy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 08/28 9:38 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Bryan Byerly. (Braddy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Status Report Mon 08/28 9:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by Bryan Byerly. (Braddy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/22 10:37 AM
Text Order DENYING7 Motion entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report and motion for entry of a scheduling order with a proposed schedule on or before August 28, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/18 7:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend the Current Stay by Bryan Byerly.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 20, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Case Thu 07/20 2:49 PM
Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART5 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. All deadlines are STAYED until August 18, 2023. The parties shall either file dismissal papers or a joint motion for entry of a scheduling order on or before August 18, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 07/20 4:43 PM
Case Stayed (lad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/18 3:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc..(Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
5 5 motion Stay Case Mon 07/17 3:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Bryan Byerly.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/23 5:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bryan Byerly as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Wed 05/24 8:53 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders:[LINK:Order Regarding Court Docket Management] and[LINK:Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure] . Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/15 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (lad)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/15 2:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bryan Byerly. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/15 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17440576), filed by Bryan Byerly.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/15 3:17 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
Related: [-]