California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:23-cv-00916
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Case Filed:May 16, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 12, 2023 12:54 AM PST
Defendant
Buzzard Trucking LLC
Represented By
Wilma J. Gray
Mcnamara Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Michael Santos Nazareta
Represented By
Joseph A. Salazar, Jr.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Jay C. Patterson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Hebrard
Represented By
Christopher William Wood
Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Hebrard
Represented By
Christopher William Wood
Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
14 14 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/20 12:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2024: This action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the Stipulation for Dismissal, ECF No.13 . Accordingly, this case is CLOSED with each party to bear its own fees and costs. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 03/15 9:42 AM
STIPULATION For Dismissal of Action with Prejudice by Charles Hebrard, Tammy Hebrard. (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
12 12 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 03/13 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/13/2024: Pursuant to the representations of Plaintiffs, the court has determined this case has settled. See ECF No.11 . Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 4/3/2024. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines/hearings are VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 03/06 4:37 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Charles Hebrard, Tammy Hebrard. Dispositional Docs due by 4/1/2024. (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 09/22 3:23 PM
MINUTES for SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held (via videoconference) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/2023, and FRCP 16 ORDER: Attorney, Neil Ferrera, present for Plaintiffs. Attorney, Wilma Gray, present for Defendant Buzzard Trucking LLC. Attorney, Jay Patterson, present for Defendant Michael Santos Nazareta. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' comments, the court ORDERS the following pre-trial case schedule: Amendments to pleadings shall be filed by 9/16/2024; Initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) shall be completed by 2/20/2024; fact discovery shall be completed by 8/16/2024; expert disclosures shall be completed by 9/16/2024; rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 10/7/2024; all expert discovery shall be completed by 1/10/2025; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be filed by 2/10/2025, and noticed for a hearing on the earliest available law and motion date in accordance with Local Rule 230(a). Motions regarding discovery shall be noticed before the Magistrate Judge, as provided by Local Rule 302(c). Except as otherwise provided in this Order, no further joinder of parties or amendments to pleadings is permitted without leave of court, good cause having been shown. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b); Johnson v. Mammoth Recreations, Inc. , 975 F.2d 604, 60910 (9th Cir. 1992). After consideration of the parties' comments related to settlement, the court directs the parties to notify the court when they have exhausted private settlement negotiations, and whether they request a court settlement conference date or referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP") prior to any Final Pretrial Conference. The parties shall file said notification or request for referral jointly, in writing. If the parties are requesting a court settlement conference, the parties shall also advise the court if the parties waive a conflict as to the assigned Magistrate Judge for the purposes of a court settlement conference. This case schedule will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days of this Order. The schedule, once final, shall not be modified except by leave of court upon showing of good cause. All provisions of the court's Civil Standing Order, located on the court's webpage for Judge Mueller are incorporated by reference into this Rule 16 Order. SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Maryann Valenoti. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Tue 09/05 12:07 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Charles Hebrard, Tammy Hebrard. (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/01 11:53 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jay C. Patterson on behalf of Michael Santos Nazareta. Attorney Patterson, Jay C. added. (Patterson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/21 2:18 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Michael Santos Nazareta. Attorney Salazar, Joseph A. added.(Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/17 4:57 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Santos Nazareta served on 5/31/2023, answer due 6/21/2023. (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/17 3:29 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Buzzard Trucking LLC served on 6/9/2023, answer due 6/30/2023. (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/30 3:46 PM
ANSWER by Buzzard Trucking LLC. Attorney Gray, Wilma J. added.(Gray, Wilma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Tue 05/16 4:22 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 05/16 4:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Buzzard Trucking LLC, Michael Santos Nazareta* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher William Wood* *Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, LLP* *20 Bicentennial Circle* *Sacramento, CA 95826*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/16 1:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Attorney Wood, Christopher William added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10861418)(Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet