Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00067
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 17, 2023 2:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Shawn Michael Daly (1)
Represented By
Melanie S. Keiper
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Joseph D. Herrold
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason T. Griess
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2023 2:42 AM CDT
Friday, March 24, 2023
Judge update in case as to Shawn Michael Daly. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Shawn Michael Daly (1) by USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (rm) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
Arrest of Shawn Michael Daly. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ORDER as to Shawn Michael Daly. Initial Appearance set for 3/27/2023 at 02:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/27/2023. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed on 3/23/2023 in case as to Shawn Michael Daly. (tae) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Initial Appearance as to Defendant Shawn Michael Daly held on 3/27/2023. Attorney Melanie S. Keiper for defendant. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Shawn Michael Daly. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL as to Shawn Michael Daly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/27/2023. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 5 ORDER as to Shawn Michael Daly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/27/2023. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Shawn Michael Daly. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL and granting 9 Oral Motion for Detention by USA as to Shawn Michael Daly (1). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/27/2023. (kmp) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: FPD Melanie S. Keiper appearing for Shawn Michael Daly (Keiper, Melanie) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
12 12 Bail/Bond Report (Sealed) as to Shawn Michael Daly. (Davidson, Priscilla) [4:23-mj-00223-HCA]
Related: [-]