Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Pitlyk
Case #: 4:23-cv-00658
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 13, 2023 3:23 AM CST
Defendant
Eleras Group, LLC
Represented By
Evan Jefferson
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Michael L. Jente
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Brian P. Pezza
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul McGuire
Represented By
Phillip Bohrer
Bohrer Law Firm
contact info
George A. Hanson
Stueve Siegel LLP
contact info
Scott Earl Brady
Bohrer Law Firm
contact info

GPO Oct 11 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for leave to file under seal, Doc. [21], is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rule 13.05. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is stayed for fourteen (14) days to allow for appeal of the denial of Doc. [21] or filing of a meritorious motion for leave to file under seal in conformity with Local Rule 13.05. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 13.05(A)(4)(g). Barring one of the foregoing, the Clerk is ordered to unseal Doc. [22], effective October 25, 2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/11/2023. (NEP)
GPO Nov 27 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Approve Settlement, Doc. 23, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Leave to File Un-redacted Settlement Agreement Under Seal, Doc. 25, is GRANTED. The un-redacted Settlement Agreement will remain sealed indefinitely. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file appropriate dismissal papers in this action no later than December 27, 2023.(Dismissal Paper(s) due by 12/27/2023.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/27/2023. (KEK)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Wed 01/17 8:52 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL...Before the Court is Plaintiff's "Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2)," Doc. [28 ]. For the reasons set forth in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated November 27, 2023, Doc. [27 ], the motion is granted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. [Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order (no. 27 ) the Sealed Documents will remain sealed indefinitely] . Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/16/2024. (NEP) Modified on 1/17/2024 (NEP)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
28 28 motion Dismiss Case Fri 12/15 8:48 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Plaintiff Paul McGuire.(Bohrer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 27, 2023
27 27 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Mon 11/27 11:43 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Approve Settlement, Doc.23 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Leave to File Un-redacted Settlement Agreement Under Seal, Doc.25 , is GRANTED. The un-redacted Settlement Agreement will remain sealed indefinitely. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file appropriate dismissal papers in this action no later than December 27, 2023.(Dismissal Paper(s) due by 12/27/2023.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/27/2023. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
26 26 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Tue 10/24 5:50 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 25 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Un-Redacted Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. Redacted Copy due by 10/27/2023.(Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
25 25 motion Leave to File Under Seal Tue 10/24 5:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Un-Redacted Settlement Agreement by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC.(Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
24 24 2 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 10/11 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for leave to file under seal, Doc. [21 ], is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rule 13.05. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is stayed for fourteen (14) days to allow for appeal of the denial of Doc. [21 ] or filing of a meritorious motion for leave to file under seal in conformity with Local Rule 13.05. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 13.05(A)(4)(g). Barring one of the foregoing, the Clerk is ordered to unseal Doc. [22 ], effective October 25, 2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/11/2023. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
23 23 motion Settlement Wed 09/13 5:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC.(Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
22 22 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Wed 09/13 5:06 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 21 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. Redacted Copy due by 9/18/2023. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Leave to File Under Seal Wed 09/13 4:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 08/11 3:18 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:19 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian) filed by Eleras Group, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Eleras Group, LLC answer due 9/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/11/2023. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/10 1:15 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 07/14 3:03 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian) filed by Eleras Group, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED Eleras Group, LLC answer due 8/14/2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/14/2023. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/13 3:23 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/27 10:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Paul McGuire. Eleras Group, LLC served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. (Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
15 15 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 06/14 9:18 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Evan Jefferson for Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Jefferson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 06/09 9:27 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Eleras Group, LLC's Consent Motion for Extension, Doc.11 , is GRANTED for good cause shown. IS IT FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant must respond to the Complaint, Doc.1 , no later than Friday, July 14, 2023. (Eleras Group, LLC answer due 7/14/2023.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/09/2023. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
13 13 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 06/08 4:48 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Jente for Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Jente, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 06/08 4:45 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eleras Group, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/08 4:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 06/08 4:42 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Brian P. Pezza for Defendant Eleras Group, LLC. (Pezza, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 order CJRA Order Thu 06/08 3:29 PM
CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (LNJ)
Related: [-]
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Thu 06/08 1:51 PM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Paul McGuire to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/13/2023. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
order A Docket Text Order Wed 05/31 2:56 PM
Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip Bohrer and7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott E. Brady. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 5/31/23. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/25 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott E. Brady. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9968283) by Plaintiff Paul McGuire.(Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/25 3:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip Bohrer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9968196) by Plaintiff Paul McGuire.(Bohrer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 18, 2023
4 4 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Thu 05/18 11:35 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Paul McGuire. (Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Notice of Process Server Thu 05/18 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Paul McGuire Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 05/18 9:19 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. (DLB)
Related: [-]
notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (CSCI) Thu 05/18 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed. Notice of Process Server form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (DLB)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 05/18 1:02 PM
AMENDED Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to George A. Hanson. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, Eleras Group, LLC must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (DLB)
Related: [-]
misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Thu 05/18 6:26 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/17 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Eleras Group, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-9953425, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Paul McGuire.(Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Eleras Group, LLC