North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:23-cv-00298
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 17, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 13, 2023 4:26 AM EST
Counter Claimant
BNI Global, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. DeAntonio
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Prosperity Brands, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. DeAntonio
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Counter Defendant
Daniel Haggerty
Represented By
John Robert Buric
James Mcelroy Diehl
contact info
John Robert Brickley
James Mcelroy Diehl
contact info
Defendant
BNI Global, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. DeAntonio
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Prosperity Brands, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. DeAntonio
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Haggerty
Represented By
John Robert Buric
James Mcelroy Diehl
contact info
John Robert Brickley
James Mcelroy Diehl
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/23 11:22 AM
Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion taken under advisement, order to issue. Plaintiffs attorney: John Buric, John Brickley. Defendants attorney: Matthew DeAntonio, Samuel Dearstyne. Court reporter: Deborah Cohen-Rojas. (ams)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 04/04 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2025 10:15 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ams)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 29, 2025
30 30 misc Appendix Sat 03/29 12:19 AM
Appendix by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Appendix re:19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,29 Reply to Response to Motion (Supplemental)(DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 43 - Deposition of Daniel HaggertyVol. I (Additional Excerpts),
Att: 2 Exhibit 44 - Deposition of Graham WeihmillerVol. I (Additional Excerpts),
Att: 3 Exhibit 45 - Deposition of Graham WeihmillerVol. II (Additional Excerpts),
Att: 4 Exhibit 46 - Deposition of Claire ShermanVol. I (Excerpts),
Att: 5 Exhibit 47 - Deposition of Claire ShermanVol. II (Additional Excerpts),
Att: 6 Exhibit 48 - Deposition of Anna Reynolds (Additional Excerpts),
Att: 7 Exhibit 49 - Deposition of Janeen Leppert Lawson (Additional Excerpts),
Att: 8 Exhibit 50 - December 10, 2020 Email, Reynolds to Haggerty,
Att: 9 Exhibit 51 - March 12, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 10 Exhibit 52 - August 19, 2021 Email, Sherman to Reynolds,
Att: 11 Exhibit 53 - August 20, 2021 Text Message, Weihmiller and Henry,
Att: 12 Exhibit 54 - August 20, 2021 Meeting Invitation, Henry to Weihmiller,
Att: 13 Exhibit 55 - Declaration of Michael Walchonski
Friday, March 28, 2025
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/28 11:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/19 9:23 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/28/2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 03/19/2025. (MKG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/18 4:00 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2025 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/13 9:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Daniel Haggerty. Replies due by 3/20/2025(Buric, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, February 27, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/27 11:11 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Daniel Haggerty. Responses due by 3/13/2025 (Buric, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/27 1:19 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/13/2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/27/2025. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
25 25 order Protective Order Mon 02/24 9:25 AM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/24/2025. (brl)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
order Order on Motion to Seal Document Sat 02/15 7:58 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 23 Motion to Seal Document re 22 . The subject document contains and discusses confidential information. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/15/2025. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
24 24 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 02/14 6:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re23 Consent MOTION to Seal Document22 Sealed Document,, by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Seal Document Fri 02/14 6:47 PM
Consent MOTION to Seal Document22 Sealed Document,, by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2025 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Sealed Document Fri 02/14 6:43 PM
Sealed Document ( Sealed - Attorney ): Sealed Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re:19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ,20 Memorandum in Support of Motion (available to BNI Global, LLC, Daniel Haggerty, Prosperity Brands, LLC)(DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 20 - BNI 2021 INCENTIVE PLAN FOR KEY LEADERS Dan Haggerty Filed under seal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 29 - Aug. 20, 2021 Email, Sherman to Weihmiller with attachmentRIF draft 2 confidential spreadsheet Filed under seal
21 21 misc Appendix Fri 02/14 6:37 PM
Appendix by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Appendix re:19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,20 Memorandum in Support of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment(DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Daniel HaggertyVol. I (Excerpts),
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition of Daniel HaggertyVol. II (Excerpts),
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition of Graham WeihmillerVol. I (Excerpts),
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition of Graham WeihmillerVol. II (Excerpts),
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition of Claire ShermanVol. II (Excerpts),
Att: 6 Exhibit Deposition of Anna Reynolds (Excerpts),
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Graham Weihmiller,
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Claire Sherman,
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Schwartz,
Att: 10 Exhibit Declaration of Jay Henry,
Att: 11 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination (1/24/2022),
Att: 12 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination (2/9/2022),
Att: 13 Exhibit Plaintiffs Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories (12/19/2024),
Att: 14 Exhibit Sept. 9, 2017 Offer Letter to Haggerty,
Att: 15 Exhibit Dec. 7, 2020 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 16 Exhibit Attachment to Dec. 7, 2020 EmailDH Career Direction Thoughts,
Att: 17 Exhibit Attachment to Dec. 7, 2020 EmailUS STRATEGY, 2021 2023,
Att: 18 Exhibit Jan. 21, 2021 Email, Weihmiller to Reynolds,
Att: 19 Exhibit Feb. 13, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 20 Exhibit BNI 2021 INCENTIVE PLAN FOR KEY LEADERS Dan Haggerty Filed under seal,
Att: 21 Exhibit Jul. 27, 2021 Email, Sherman to Weihmiller,
Att: 22 Exhibit Aug. 11, 2021 Email, Kollias to Haggerty with attachmentQuarterly Performance Check-in,
Att: 23 Exhibit Scanned DocumentWeihmiller Message to Kollias,
Att: 24 Exhibit Aug. 25, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Kollias,
Att: 25 Exhibit Jul. 11, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 26 Exhibit May 10, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 27 Exhibit July 7, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 28 Exhibit July 6, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 29 Exhibit Aug. 20, 2021 Email, Sherman to Weihmiller with attachmentRIF draft 2_confidential spreadsheet - REDACTED / Unredacted Version to be Filed under seal,
Att: 30 Exhibit Aug. 2021, 2021 WhatsApp Messages, Haggerty to Weihmiller,
Att: 31 Exhibit Aug. 2223, 2021 Text Messages, Sherman and Weihmiller,
Att: 32 Exhibit Aug. 20, 2021 Email, Leppert to Weihmiller,
Att: 33 Exhibit Aug. 23, 2021 Microsoft Teams Chat, Sherman and Haggerty,
Att: 34 Exhibit Aug. 24, 2021 Email, Weihmiller to Kollias with attachmentImportant and Confidential Performance Warning,
Att: 35 Exhibit Aug. 24, 2021 Microsoft Teams Messages, Haggerty and Brooke,
Att: 36 Exhibit Aug. 23, 2021 Email, Haggerty to Brooke,
Att: 37 Exhibit Aug. 24, 2021 Email, Brooke to Haggerty,
Att: 38 Exhibit Aug. 25, 2021 Termination Letter to Haggerty,
Att: 39 Exhibit Sept. 23, 2021 Award Letter to Haggerty with enclosureTerms and Conditions,
Att: 40 Exhibit Equity Incentive Plan,
Att: 41 Exhibit Deposition of Daniel HaggertyVol. III (Excerpts),
Att: 42 Exhibit Deposition of Janeen Leppert Lawson (Excerpts)
20 20 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 02/14 6:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 02/14 5:45 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2025 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 motion Protective Order Thu 02/13 3:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 2/27/2025 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/20 9:44 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines to File Dispositive Motions by Prosperity Brands, LLC, BNI Global, LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2025 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/20 9:53 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Motions due by 2/14/2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 12/20/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 10/16 2:07 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Status of Remaining Claims by Daniel Haggerty (Buric, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines Thu 10/03 10:31 AM
Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/22/2024. Motions due by 12/20/2024. Jury Trial set for 8/18/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. (ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 09/25 10:41 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery completion extended to 11/22/2024. Dispositive motions due by 12/20/2024. Ready for trial date extended to 8/18/2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 9/25/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Tue 09/24 2:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct7 Scheduling Order, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 10/8/2024 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 09/19 5:16 PM
Minute Order: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Having reviewed the parties' written submissions and considered counsel's arguments, the Court enters the following ORDER. Defendant's request for a protective order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) that "Plaintiff may not seek discovery of the personal sex lives of Defendants' witnesses and employees" is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: the parties shall not affirmatively inquire into the personal sex lives of Defendants' employees or any witnesses. However, should the topic arise unprompted and if the parties' are unable to resolve the issue themselves, then they are granted leave to contact the Court telephonically for further discussion. So Ordered. Plaintiffs attorney: John Robert Brickley, John Robert Buric. Defendants attorney: Matthew S. DeAntonio, Samuel Martin Dearstyne. Court reporter: N/A. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
14 14 adr Report of Mediation Thu 09/12 1:56 PM
REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Partially Settled. (James, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/11 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/19/2024 02:00 PM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (brl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/06 10:58 AM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order (Joint Motion) by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 8/20/2024 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 08/06 11:05 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Discovery Deadline). Discovery deadline extended to 9/27/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 8/6/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/23 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Martin Dearstyne on behalf of BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC (Dearstyne, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
11 11 motion Amend/Correct Wed 05/22 9:44 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct7 Scheduling Order, by BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. Responses due by 6/5/2024 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 05/22 3:36 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/30/2024. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 7/15/2024. Defendants' Expert Reports due by 8/15/2024. Mediation Deadline set for 9/13/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2024. Ready for Trial Date February 17, 2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 5/22/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
10 10 adr Designation of Mediator Fri 04/26 9:35 AM
DESIGNATION of Jason James as Mediator by all the parties. (Buric, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/26/2024) (llp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
9 9 misc Miscellaneous Filing Mon 01/08 10:52 AM
Miscellaneous Filing by Daniel Haggerty. Designation of Secure Leave (Buric, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Miscellaneous Filing Mon 01/08 10:36 AM
Miscellaneous Filing by Daniel Haggerty. Designation of Secure Leave (Buric, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/12 11:23 AM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: One (1) to Two (2) Weeks. Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Mediation deadline set for 6/14/2024. Motions due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 9/12/2023. (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
6 6 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Thu 09/07 4:34 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Buric, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Thu 08/17 9:35 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/7/2023. (ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 08/14 4:53 PM
ANSWER to4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Daniel Haggerty.(Buric, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 07/24 6:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and , COUNTERCLAIM against Daniel Haggerty by Prosperity Brands, LLC, BNI Global, LLC.(DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Equity Incentive Plan,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - BNI Global Restrictive Covenant,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Award Letter
Monday, June 12, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/12 5:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Prosperity Brands, LLC, BNI Global, LLC. Prosperity Brands, LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/24/2023; BNI Global, LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/18 9:01 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to BNI Global, LLC, Prosperity Brands, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/17 6:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Daniel Haggerty.(Buric, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/18 8:58 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (mdp)
Related: [-]