Janice Moseley v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02118 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2023 5:19 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Janice Moseley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/13 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/18/2023), Janice Moseley v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02118-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Alabama (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/18 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/18 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11108151.), filed by Janice Moseley. Service due by 8/16/2023(sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/18 2:37 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/18/2023), Janice Moseley v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02118-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Alabama (sshe, ) |