Welk et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02142 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-02681 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 6:00 AM EST |
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Rotner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Linn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dudley Locke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie McMillian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Middleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Watford Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Pierce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Ramey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ernest Smiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Taylor
218170 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Welk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Trausneck Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosilyn Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Officer Arthur Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Falco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PSO Andrew Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MC Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Burkhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freddie Byrd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Campos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Colon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Daniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Debose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tameka Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Edwards
Williamsburg County Detention Center 207 S Jackson Street
Kingstree, SC 29556 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl O. Kendall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reed Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Gamble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Gonzalez
217075 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Hwy 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29572 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Hauck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Heilhecker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
El Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penelope Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Insley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Justin Reid Matteson, Lewis Wilcher, Robert Pittman, Paul Albinger, David Pegg, Peter Spagnotti, Sr., Rosilyn Wilson, Barry Fridley, Veronica Landry, Dale Turnage, David Manners, Rocco Morra, Mark Ehlers, Steven Kennedy, George Mattison, Keely Marrs, Randy Cohn, Dorothy Parker NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Adams, Sylvia Gomez, Joseph Pettis, Gregory Rocha, Claudis Anderson, Eric Bryant, Darryl Ford, Tammy Metz, Paul Clennon, Karl O. Kendall, Larry Taylor, Gregory Molden, Aaron Perez, Charles Dykstra, Kenneth Hinshaw, Helen Edwards, Nicholas (I) Krause, Kristina Lipsky, Curtis Colbert, Jeffrey Rainwater, Rosendo Contreras Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
11 | 11
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 09/09 2:41 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document (13 in 2:23-cv-03526-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-02220-RMG, 5862 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-01952-RMG, 13 in 2:23-cv-04927-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-04346-RMG, 11 in 2:23-cv-04925-RMG, 12 in 2:23-cv-04923-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-02142-RMG, 25 in 2:22-cv-00303-RMG, 12 in 2:23-cv-04180-RMG, 9 in 2:23-cv-03554-RMG, 17 in 2:23-cv-06974-RMG, 23 in 2:22-cv-00025-RMG, 24 in 2:22-cv-02478-RMG, 13 in 2:23-cv-02218-RMG, 11 in 2:23-cv-04920-RMG, 12 in 2:23-cv-00527-RMG, 11 in 2:23-cv-05738-RMG, 18 in 2:22-cv-00307-RMG, 22 in 2:23-cv-00528-RMG) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,. First attachment description: Exhibit A to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Gutierrez, Gerold Main, Kevin Piska, Ramiro Gonzales, Darrell Elmore, Debra Jones, Kendall Moore, David Johnson, Jack Shanks, Kimberly Middleton, Daniel Grigsby, John Smith, Diana Kim Patterson-Luton, Nicholas Leon, James Malone, Dale Bradley, Clyde Turney, Earl Hoal, Gary Roberts, Dennis Williams NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/19 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Strait, Lorenzo Torres, Laura Watson, Ronald Ackley, Shelton Bobo, Randy Cohn, Eleanor Hoff-Moreno, Russell Hunt, Wayne Jakubczak, Tony McGann, Maurice Burden Sr, Glenn Guillory Sr, Marsha Parish, Eddie Peredo, MC Brown, David Burkhardt, Freddie Byrd, Bruce Edwards, Frederick Falco, Kevin Hauck, El Henry, Kimberly Middleton, Rosilyn Wilson, Melvin Andrews, Villareal Baldomero, James Beck, Anthony Benedetti, Dale Brandon, Arthur Burrola, Michael Cromer, Lance Elliot, Daniel Grigsby, Gary Harper, J.E. Honeycutt, Grote James, Kirk Kent, Dennis Littell, Peter O'Sullivan, Dennis Raquet, John Rhyne, Robert Rutherford, Jonathan C Schwarz, Wilhem Shield, John Smith, Mark Stephenson, Philip Thomas, James Wagenbrenner, Edward Waido, Gary Wood, Dennis Youngkin Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reed Fletcher without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Fletcher, Reed; Gonzalez, Carlos; Jenkins, Dale; Mcmillian, Willie; Pierce, Leroy; Ramey, Donald; Rotner, Melvin; Smiley, Ernest; Trausneck Jr., Edwin; Watkins, Eddie; Acosta Vallejo, Manuel; Blymier, Charles; Carroll, Terrance; Charles, Geraldine; Glenn, Derrick; Hill, Anthony L.; Joseph-Pauline, Joachim; Mathis, Eddie; Montoya, Robert; Norton, Marian; Reedy, Everett; Robinson, Joyce; Taylor, David E; Tomsic Jr, William H; Wilson Jr., Russell; Acuff, Ethan; Ramirez, Emma; Ramirez, NeldaAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02142-RMG, 2:23-cv-02143-RMG, 2:23-cv-02144-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/19/2023), 1:23-cv-02681, Welk et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02142-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 05/19 12:20 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02681. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 05/19 12:29 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/19/2023), 1:23-cv-02681, Welk et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02142-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/19 9:07 AM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/20/2023) (vba) |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Fri 05/19 9:09 AM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151800/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-27542291).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial |