Patterson et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02145 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-02693 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 6:00 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ritter, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rudser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Romero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fabian Romero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Roach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Reedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Queen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Pigott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Schwab
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Sharpe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Constance Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Norton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Snowden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Spytek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Livisitone Tautau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Thornton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Vega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oliver Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eunice Charles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Burns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Counts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Brown
2200 Standing Springs Rd Rt 4
Greenville, SC 29605 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Brockway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Benoit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suellem Arndt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Finke III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Giangreco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Greer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Hammontree
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Hanes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darryl Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Henderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desean Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Ingram, NY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Irwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Treva Mays-Soles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franky McGee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendell Mcafoos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Metcalf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Moran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudis Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Olive
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Adams, Sylvia Gomez, Joseph Pettis, Gregory Rocha, Claudis Anderson, Eric Bryant, Darryl Ford, Tammy Metz, Paul Clennon, Karl O. Kendall, Larry Taylor, Gregory Molden, Aaron Perez, Charles Dykstra, Kenneth Hinshaw, Helen Edwards, Nicholas (I) Krause, Kristina Lipsky, Curtis Colbert, Jeffrey Rainwater, Rosendo Contreras Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peter Bonds, James Brown Kastro, Troy Jefferson, Jemma Leger, Donnie McDaniel, Roger Oates, Douglas Priutt, John Reid, John Wiederecht, Alonzo Williams, Robert Brockway, Ronald Brown, John Giangreco, Troy Henderson, Desean Howard, Franky McGee, Randall Morris, Tammy Norton, Robert Ritter, Jr., Fabian Romero, Michael Schwab, Timothy Thomas, Robert McLauchlan, Donald Miletello, Sean Patterson, Emil Rodriguez, Scott Tutrow, Tabetha Alonzo, Jenna Carroll, Jimmy Easton, Elizabeth Garcia, Persophone Guitron, Mike Jackson, Mike Jackson, Ilyea Shanz, Teaff Toka, Timothy Vaden, David and Ethan Acuff, Joe Bankston, Sherry and Hector Castro, Judy Haralson, Elizabeth Hill, Carla Hilton, Kevin Roberts, Derrick and Patricia Veanueva Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ethan Acuss without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Acuff, Ethan; Ramirez, Emma; Ramirez, Nelda; Erwin, Tina; Greer, Ron; Hanes, Jeffrey; Harris, Oliver; Ramirez, Maria; Reedy, Eric; Romero, Jesus; Smith, Constance; Smith, Timothy; Thompson, James E; Vega, Luis; Bent, James; Davis, Marvin; Jones, Andre M; Kindred, David W.; Luqman, Abdus; Robbins, Bucky; Adley, Sabrina; Bankston, Jedediah; Ivie, Joe; Lowe, Allanah; Lowe, Deshawe; Martin, Eldon; Sager, David; Sager, NicoleAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02144-RMG, 2:23-cv-02145-RMG, 2:23-cv-02213-RMG, 2:23-cv-02217-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/19/2023), 1:23-cv-02693, Patterson et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02145-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 05/19 1:15 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02693. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 05/19 1:24 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/19/2023), 1:23-cv-02693, Patterson et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02145-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/19 9:25 AM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/20/2023) (vba) |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Fri 05/19 9:26 AM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 3M Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27543466).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |