Gilliard v. Limestone County
Original Case: 6:22-cv-01252
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cr-50378 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 4:01 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Limestone County District Attorney Office
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Roy Defriend
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jeff James
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Adrian Gilliard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Adrian Cotterll Gilliard
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 06 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-50378 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK , Judge: EHJ , Judge: ASO Mandate issue date is 02/28/2024 [23-50378] |
Docket last updated: 02/07/2024 4:01 AM CST |
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Adrian Gilliard 23-50378 (AS) |