SEC v. Novinger
Original Case: 4:15-cv-00358
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-usc-10525 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 3:40 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Christopher A. Novinger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ICAN Investment Group, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
![]() PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-10525 Dismissed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: JES , Judge: SAH Mandate issue date is 05/13/2024 [23-10525] |
Docket last updated: 03/20/2024 3:40 AM CDT |
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
![]() |