Original Case: 6:22-cv-01243

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-03091
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:55 AM MDT
Amicus Curiae
THE BUCKEYE INSTITUTE
Represented By
David Christian Tryon
The Buckeye Institute
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
Daniel T. Woislaw
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Alexander Jon Smith
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
NEW CIVIL LIBERTIES ALLIANCE
Represented By
Markham S. Chenoweth
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Amicus Curiae
KANSAS PET ADVOCATES
Represented By
Jason D. Petropoulos
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Sheila Martinsen
Kansas Pet Advocates
contact info
Brittany M.J. Record
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JUSTIN SMITH, D.V.M., in his official capacity as Animal Health Commissioner at the Kansas Department of Agriculture
Represented By
Arthur S. Chalmers
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Kansas
contact info
Anthony John Powell
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Kansas
contact info
Kurtis K. Wiard
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Kansas
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SCOTT JOHNSON
Represented By
Jeffrey Shaw
Kansas Justice Institute
contact info
Samuel Guy MacRoberts
Kansas Justice Institute
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HARLENE HOYT
Represented By
Jeffrey Shaw
Kansas Justice Institute
contact info
Samuel Guy MacRoberts
Kansas Justice Institute
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
COVEY FIND KENNEL, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Shaw
Kansas Justice Institute
contact info
Samuel Guy MacRoberts
Kansas Justice Institute
contact info

GPO Jun 10 2024
[11096509] Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part and Remanded; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published. Judges Hartz (authoring), Phillips and Carson. Mandate to issue. [23-3091]

Docket last updated: 06/11/2024 4:55 AM MDT
Friday, May 19, 2023
[11000597] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/19/2023 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/02/2023 for Covey Find Kennel, LLC, Harlene Hoyt and Scott Johnson. Notice of appearance due on 06/02/2023 for Justin Smith. Disclosure statement due on 06/02/2023 for Covey Find Kennel, LLC 23-3091
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Preliminary Record
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil