Allen v. Knowlton, et al
Original Case: 5:22-cv-04049
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-03092 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2024 4:07 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
KRAIG KNOWLTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANGIE KRAHE, in their official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MIKE ALLEN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 4:07 AM MST |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
[11000766] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/22/2023 Notice of appearance due on 06/22/2023 for Mike Allen. Notice of appearance due on 06/05/2023 for Kraig Knowlton and Angie Krahe. 23-3092 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |