Cara Rowland v. BISSELL Homecare Inc
Original Case: 2:22-cv-01500
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01940 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2023 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
BISSELL HOMECARE INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CARA ROWLAND, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 10 2023
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: SHWARTZ, RESTREPO and CHUNG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 20. Judge: SHWARTZ Authoring. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960]--[Edited 07/10/2023 by JK] |
Docket last updated: 07/11/2023 4:31 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant BISSELL Homecare Inc in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01500. Transferred from Misc No. 23-8012 --[Edited 05/23/2023 by JK] (JK) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
2 pgs CLERK ORDER, The appeals at Nos. 23-1940 and 23-1941 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling and disposition. In accordance with the Court's order entered May 15, 2023, in Nos. 23-8009 23-8010 23-8011 and 23-8012 Appellants' opening briefs and joint appendices shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on May 26, 2023; Appellees' briefs shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on June 5, 2023; and Appellants' reply briefs shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on June 12, 2023. The parties are encouraged to file consolidated briefs, adopt arguments by reference, or join in another brief to the extent possible to reduce the possibility of repetitive briefs. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Briefing extensions will not be entertained absent an agreement from the parties to extend the sixty (60) day deadline. See 28 U.S.C. Section: 1453(c)(2) & (3). The briefs, appendices, and any required forms or motions must only be filed on the general docket numbers. The appeals will be scheduled for disposition during the week of July 10, 2023. The Court will advise the parties whether the case will be called for argument on a later date; however, counsel should plan to be available. 23-1940 23-1941 (JK) |