Original Case: 2:21-cv-01992

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cr-30340
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 4:05 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
New Orleans City
Represented By
Elizabeth Silvis Robins
City of New Orleans
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ed Michel, Interim Inspector of the Office of Inspector General, in official and individual capacities
Represented By
Peter Joseph Rotolo III
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Walter Francis Becker Jr.
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Amy Lee McIntire
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bobbie Jones
Represented By
Peter Joseph Rotolo III
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
H. Michael Bush
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Amy Lee McIntire
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Office of the Inspector General
Represented By
Peter Joseph Rotolo III
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Amy Lee McIntire
Chaffe McCall, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kristen Morales
Represented By
Stephanie Dovalina
contact info

GPO Jun 17 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-30340 Affirmed in Part ] Judge: PEH, Judge: JES, Judge: SAH Mandate issue date is 07/09/2024 [23-30340]

Docket last updated: 06/18/2024 4:05 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Kristen Morales 23-30340 (MAS)
Related: [-]