Adley et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02217 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 7:23-cv-02788 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn and Eldon Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Hilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick and Patricia Veanueva
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Sager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristi Rolen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
N.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Haralson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Fultz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D.V., G.V. and J.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry and Hector Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Bankston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B.S. and T.M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel and Sylvia Alonzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabrina Adley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David and Ethan Acuff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A.L and D.L.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Broome, Charles Helfrich, Brian Clark, Eugene Rosek, Derrick and Patricia Veanueva, Darren Danico, Billy Cales, George Crockett, Derrick Day, Timothy Hadley, Rob Hibbitt, Richard Monroe, Bryan Reed, Kenneth Winter, Lary Coates Sr., Michael DiGiuro, Norbert Elkey, Oliver Evans, Kimberly Fontenot, Clarence Green, David Harmon, Ken Hayes, Charles Hurd, Beverly Kindred, William Mizett, Malcolm Smith, Donald Stagg, Typhore Stanley, Gregory Thomas, Karen Armstrong, Robert Clawson, Robert Murphy, Oscar Almazan, Carmen Meranza, Mechel Baker, Byron Bradford, Claudia Goldner, Paul Green, Charlie Hill, Carl Hodge, Dennis Joiner, Charles Lee Jr, Billy Mills, Dean Monington, Willie Roberts, Richard Tracy, Christine Triplett, Tom Walsh Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peter Bonds, James Brown Kastro, Troy Jefferson, Jemma Leger, Donnie McDaniel, Roger Oates, Douglas Priutt, John Reid, John Wiederecht, Alonzo Williams, Robert Brockway, Ronald Brown, John Giangreco, Troy Henderson, Desean Howard, Franky McGee, Randall Morris, Tammy Norton, Robert Ritter, Jr., Fabian Romero, Michael Schwab, Timothy Thomas, Robert McLauchlan, Donald Miletello, Sean Patterson, Emil Rodriguez, Scott Tutrow, Tabetha Alonzo, Jenna Carroll, Jimmy Easton, Elizabeth Garcia, Persophone Guitron, Mike Jackson, Mike Jackson, Ilyea Shanz, Teaff Toka, Timothy Vaden, David and Ethan Acuff, Joe Bankston, Sherry and Hector Castro, Judy Haralson, Elizabeth Hill, Carla Hilton, Kevin Roberts, Derrick and Patricia Veanueva Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ethan Acuss without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Acuff, Ethan; Ramirez, Emma; Ramirez, Nelda; Erwin, Tina; Greer, Ron; Hanes, Jeffrey; Harris, Oliver; Ramirez, Maria; Reedy, Eric; Romero, Jesus; Smith, Constance; Smith, Timothy; Thompson, James E; Vega, Luis; Bent, James; Davis, Marvin; Jones, Andre M; Kindred, David W.; Luqman, Abdus; Robbins, Bucky; Adley, Sabrina; Bankston, Jedediah; Ivie, Joe; Lowe, Allanah; Lowe, Deshawe; Martin, Eldon; Sager, David; Sager, NicoleAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02144-RMG, 2:23-cv-02145-RMG, 2:23-cv-02213-RMG, 2:23-cv-02217-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/24/2023), 7:23-cv-02788, Adley et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02217-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 05/24 2:44 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:23-cv-02788. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 05/24 2:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/24/2023), 7:23-cv-02788, Adley et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02217-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so redesignated. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/24 1:12 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/20/2023) (vba) |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Wed 05/24 1:13 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 56391/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27557081).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |