Green et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02218 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-02793 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:51 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
individually 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Randy Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Willingham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mathews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas McConnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Rosek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Sanchez Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Schuetz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Seay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vilma Smolka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Stefano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julius Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Trevino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Basil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Brady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Breazeale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Demmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Duggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Ehlers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Gonser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Halloway Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grant Harris Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Iverson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damon Ivy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Johnson Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Linn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Justin Reid Matteson, Lewis Wilcher, Robert Pittman, Paul Albinger, David Pegg, Peter Spagnotti, Sr., Rosilyn Wilson, Barry Fridley, Veronica Landry, Dale Turnage, David Manners, Rocco Morra, Mark Ehlers, Steven Kennedy, George Mattison, Keely Marrs, Randy Cohn, Dorothy Parker NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 09/09 2:41 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document (13 in 2:23-cv-03526-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-02220-RMG, 5862 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-01952-RMG, 13 in 2:23-cv-04927-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-04346-RMG, 11 in 2:23-cv-04925-RMG, 12 in 2:23-cv-04923-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-02142-RMG, 25 in 2:22-cv-00303-RMG, 12 in 2:23-cv-04180-RMG, 9 in 2:23-cv-03554-RMG, 17 in 2:23-cv-06974-RMG, 23 in 2:22-cv-00025-RMG, 24 in 2:22-cv-02478-RMG, 13 in 2:23-cv-02218-RMG, 11 in 2:23-cv-04920-RMG, 12 in 2:23-cv-00527-RMG, 11 in 2:23-cv-05738-RMG, 18 in 2:22-cv-00307-RMG, 22 in 2:23-cv-00528-RMG) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,. First attachment description: Exhibit A to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Gutierrez, Gerold Main, Kevin Piska, Ramiro Gonzales, Darrell Elmore, Debra Jones, Kendall Moore, David Johnson, Jack Shanks, Kimberly Middleton, Daniel Grigsby, John Smith, Diana Kim Patterson-Luton, Nicholas Leon, James Malone, Dale Bradley, Clyde Turney, Earl Hoal, Gary Roberts, Dennis Williams NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Broome, Charles Helfrich, Brian Clark, Eugene Rosek, Derrick and Patricia Veanueva, Darren Danico, Billy Cales, George Crockett, Derrick Day, Timothy Hadley, Rob Hibbitt, Richard Monroe, Bryan Reed, Kenneth Winter, Lary Coates Sr., Michael DiGiuro, Norbert Elkey, Oliver Evans, Kimberly Fontenot, Clarence Green, David Harmon, Ken Hayes, Charles Hurd, Beverly Kindred, William Mizett, Malcolm Smith, Donald Stagg, Typhore Stanley, Gregory Thomas, Karen Armstrong, Robert Clawson, Robert Murphy, Oscar Almazan, Carmen Meranza, Mechel Baker, Byron Bradford, Claudia Goldner, Paul Green, Charlie Hill, Carl Hodge, Dennis Joiner, Charles Lee Jr, Billy Mills, Dean Monington, Willie Roberts, Richard Tracy, Christine Triplett, Tom Walsh Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gerald Green without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Brady, Jennifer; Gonser, Patricia; Green, Gerald A.; Halloway Jr., Louis; Iverson, Gary L.; Linn, Paula; Martinez, Randy; Trevino, Jesus; Willingham, John; Alexander, Timothy; Atkinson, Hazel; Bohannon, Drelvis; Cantu, Tomas; Cooper, Gordon L; Dittmar, Robert; Evans, Otto; Farrell, Bradley; Gilbert, Michael A; Gonzalez, Frank; Grigsdy, Jerome; Kromer, James A; Peterson, Ronnie; Robinson, Charles; Selvi Junior, James; Stephens, LoisAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02218-RMG, 2:23-cv-02219-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/19 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Julius Walker Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02218-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/24/2023), 1:23-cv-02793, Green et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02218-RMG (sshe, ) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 05/24 2:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02793. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 05/24 3:12 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/24/2023), 1:23-cv-02793, Green et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02218-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/24 1:33 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/20/2023) (vba) |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Wed 05/24 1:37 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/12/2023 without transcription or recording. Counsel for all parties were present. In light of the Multi-District Litigation Panels conditional transfer order and the expectation that this case will shortly be transferred, the 4/18/23 conference is adjourned indefinitely. In the event the case has not been transferred by 4/30/23, counsel for both parties should call the Court to schedule further proceedings.. (Kotowski, Linda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: No application for adjournment will be considered unless made within one week of the date of this notice. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/6/2023) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151909/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27557458).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |