Frederick BanksIn re: Frederick Banks
Original Case: 2:23-mc-00465
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01933 |
Type | civil / united states as party / other civil |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 30, 2023 4:27 AM EDT |
Plaintiff - Appellant
In re: FREDERICK H. BANKS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 24 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: SHWARTZ, MATEY and FREEMAN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 3. CLD-193 |
Docket last updated: 08/30/2023 4:27 AM EDT |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks in District Court No. 2-23-mc-00465. (TMM) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs DC Memorandum 5/12/23 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs caption | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |