Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00267
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Last checked: Friday May 26, 2023 2:32 AM CDT
Defendant
John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (1)
Represented By
Ricardo L Salinas
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Nehemias Car-Estrada
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Jorge David Galvez-Claros
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Ana Elizabeth Mejia-Murillo
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Pablo Perez
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
John George Edward Marck
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2023 3:22 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
Arrest of John-Joseph Rene Delagarza. (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. John George Edward Marck appearing for USA, filed.(Marck, John) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 5/8/2023 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Jorge David Galvez-Claros, Pablo Perez, Ana Elizabeth Mejia-Murillo, Nehemias Car-Estrada as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 5/8/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton, filed. (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Jorge David Galvez-Claros, Pablo Perez, Ana Elizabeth Mejia-Murillo, Nehemias Car-Estrada. Ruben R Lerma appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (LisaMGonzalez, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Jorge David Galvez-Claros as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 5/8/2023. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., MW CONDITIONS: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond, 3rd party custodian approved by USPO, residence approved prior to release, not to commit any new crimes and must come to all future hearings., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given. Appearances: Robert Thorpe, AUSA; Ruben Lerma, Jr. f/Material Witness; USM: Deputy De Los Santos. (Digital # 9:29-9:38) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: S. Buckley/used). (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Pablo Perez as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 5/8/2023. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., AUSA states the material witness has prior removal/immigration history and moves for detention. Court accepts a waiver of the detention hearing without prejudice., Rights to consular notification given. Detention Hearing reset for May 11, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Material Witness Hearing set for 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton Appearances: Robert Thorpe, AUSA; Ruben Lerma, Jr. f/Material Witness; USM: Deputy De Los Santos. (Digital # 9:29-9:38) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: S. Buckley/used). (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Ana Elizabeth Mejia-Murillo as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 5/8/2023. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., AUSA states the material witness has prior removal/immigration history and moves for detention. Court accepts a waiver of the detention hearing without prejudice., Rights to consular notification given. Detention Hearing reset for May 11, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Material Witness Hearing set for 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton Appearances: Robert Thorpe, AUSA; Ruben Lerma, Jr. f/Material Witness; USM: Deputy De Los Santos. (Digital # 9:29-9:38) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: S. Buckley/used). (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Nehemias Car-Estrada as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 5/8/2023. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., MW CONDITIONS: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond, 3rd party custodian approved by USPO, residence approved prior to release, not to commit any new crimes and must come to all future hearings., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given. Appearances: Robert Thorpe, AUSA; Ruben Lerma, Jr. f/Material Witness; USM: Deputy De Los Santos. (Digital # 9:29-9:38) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: S. Buckley/used). (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (Defendant informed of rights) held on 5/8/2023. Defendant will retain counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for an expedited detention hearing based on Defendant's minimal criminal history. Court grants expedited hearing. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton. Appearances: Robert Thorpe, AUSA; USM: Deputy De Los Santos. (Digital # 9:41-10:03) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ricardo L Salinas appearing for John-Joseph Rene Delagarza , filed.(Salinas, Ricardo) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza, filed. (rrios, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by John-Joseph Rene Delagarza, filed. [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza held on 5/9/2023 Defendant waives preliminary hearing in open court. Court may rely upon the complaint as the testimony of the agent for purposes of weighing the evidence during the detention hearing. Defense counsel requests the Court set bond. Government does not oppose bond. Court sets bond. Court sets the following bond conditions: 1. $40,000 Bond / $1000 cash deposit.2. The defendant must not violate federal state, or local law while on bond.3. Pretrial Supervision in the Southern District of Texas McAllen Division.4. Maintain or actively seek employment. Resume or commence an educational program.5. Obtain no passport.6. Travel restricted to the McAllen Division with permission to travel to Corpus Christi for court related matters. Outside travel to be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office.7. Avoid all contact with victims or potential victims.8. Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons.9. Refrain from excessive use of alcohol.10. Refrain from use or unlawful possession of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner.11. You shall not use or consume products containing or marketed as containing Cannabidiol (CBD).12. Submit to any alcohol/drug testing as directed by the U.S. Probation Office.13. Report Contact with Law Enforcement. 14. Defendant agrees to attend all scheduled material witness depositions. Defendant agrees and stipulatesthat failure to attend a scheduled deposition constitutes a knowing waiver of the Defendants right to bepresent during the deposition and may constitute a waiver of Defendants right to confront and crossexaminethe witness(es). Appearances: Patricia Booth, AUSA; Ricardo L. Salinas f/Defendant; USM: Deputy Mayo. (Digital # 9:44-9:48) (ERO: Jared Marks) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (AnnSalazar, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Bond payment received for John-Joseph Rene Delagarza. Payment submitted by Stephanie Renay De La Garza in the amount of $1,000.00. Receipt number # MCA026714, filed. (LElizondo, 7) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza. John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (1) Secured $40,000/ $1,000 Cash Deposit ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified. (SashaOzuna, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
9 9 Appearance Bond Entered as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza in amount of $ 40,000 Secured/ $1,000 Cash Deposit, Receipt # MCA026714., filed.(SashaOzuna, 2) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
10 10 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Material Witness Pablo Perez in the case of John-Joseph Rene Delagarza, filed.(Lerma, Ruben) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Material Witness Ana Elizabeth Mejia-Murillo in the case of John-Joseph Rene Delagarza, filed.(Lerma, Ruben) [2:23-mj-00348]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
12 12 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza (1) count(s) 1-4, filed. (SashaOzuna, 2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
13 13 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza, filed.(SashaOzuna, 2)
Related: [-]
14 14 SCHEDULING ORDER as to John-Joseph Rene Delagarza. Arraignment set for 6/1/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (SashaOzuna, 2)
Related: [-]