Original Case: 3:17-cv-02278

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcf-10536
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit740 Labor - Railway Labor Act
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 9:15 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
Freedom From Religion Foundation
Represented By
Samuel Troxell Grover
Freedom From Religion Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Airlines for America
Represented By
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Alliance Defending Freedom
Represented By
James A. Campbell
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Ryan L. Bangert
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Gregory Logan Chafuen
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
John J. Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Southwest Airlines Company
Represented By
Paulo B. McKeeby
Reed Smith, L.L.P.
contact info
Shay Dvoretzky
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, L.L.P.
contact info
Steven Marcus
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, L.L.P.
contact info
Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Local 556, Transport Workers Union of America
Represented By
Adam S. Greenfield
Law Office of Cloutman & Greenfield, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Southwest Airlines Company
Represented By
Paulo B. McKeeby
Reed Smith, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charlene Carter
Represented By
Matthew Brandon Gilliam
National Right to Work
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Charlene Carter
Represented By
David Watkins
Jenkins & Watkins, P.C.
contact info
Matthew D. Hill
Pryor & Bruce
contact info
Bobby G. Pryor
Pryor & Bruce
contact info
Matthew Brandon Gilliam
National Right to Work
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work
contact info

GPO May 08 2025
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-10008 Affirmed in Part 23-10536 Affirmed in Part 23-10836 Affirmed in Part] Judge: EBC, Judge: KDE, Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 05/30/2025. [23-10008, 23-10536, 23-10836]

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 9:15 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Charlene Carter 23-10536 (AS)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. 23-10536 (Shay Dvoretzky )
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. 23-10536 (Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid )
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. 23-10536 (Steven Marcus )
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. 23-10536 (Hanaa Khan )
Related: [-]