Original Case: 6:19-cv-01138

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-03094
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Jun 12, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2023 2:28 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellant
ALONZO D. ANDERSON
Represented By
Alonzo D. Anderson
Butler County Adult Detention Facility
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KCI AUTO AUCTION, INC.
Represented By
Shawn E. Stewart
Stewart Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jun 12 2023
[11005462] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Holmes, Bacharach and Phillips. [23-3094]

Docket last updated: 06/13/2023 2:28 AM MDT
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
[11001344] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/23/2023. Fee or 1915 forms due in district court 06/23/2023 for Alonzo D. Anderson. Notice of appearance due on 06/23/2023 for Alonzo D. Anderson. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 06/07/2023 for KCI Auto Auction, Inc. 23-3094
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se
2 pgs [11001486] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant's memorandum brief due 06/07/2023 for Alonzo D. Anderson. Regular proceedings, including briefing on the merits, are suspended pending further order. Please see attached order for additional information. 23-3094
Related: [-]