California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-04098
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 23SMCV01769
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 4:09 AM PST
Defendant
Amazon Delivery Service Partner
Defendant
Amazon Fulfillment Center
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Ross Eleazer Bautista
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Oliver M Gold
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
OUSPT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jayvin Harden
Represented By
Arash Nematollahi
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Christopher Bates Adamson
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Alan A Ahdoot
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Latonyua Harden
Represented By
Arash Nematollahi
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Christopher Bates Adamson
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Alan A Ahdoot
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor Harden
Represented By
Arash Nematollahi
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Christopher Bates Adamson
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Alan A Ahdoot
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick Harden, Jr.
Represented By
Arash Nematollahi
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Christopher Bates Adamson
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Alan A Ahdoot
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
53 53 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/28 3:37 PM
REPLY In Support of Amazon.com Services LLC's Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens 47 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Gold, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX A
52 52 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 3:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND ADAMSON AHDOOT LLP 48 filed by Plaintiffs Jayvin Harden, Latonyua Harden, Taylor Harden, Frederick Harden, Jr., MGW II.(Nematollahi, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Arash Nematollahi in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Amazon.Com Services LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and Adamson Ahdoot LLP,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration of Arash Nematollahi
Monday, April 21, 2025
51 51 29 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 7:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens 47 filed by Plaintiffs Jayvin Harden, Latonyua Harden, Taylor Harden, Frederick Harden, Jr., MGW II.(Nematollahi, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Haslel Maria Del Carmen Aguirre Garzon,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit I to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit J to Decl. of Arash Nematollahi