New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00593
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2023 1:31 AM MDT
Defendant
Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez (1)
Represented By
Sarah M. Gorman
Law Offices Of Robert D. Gorman
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Mindy Pirkovic
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rumaldo R Armijo
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/27/2023 2:39 AM MDT
Thursday, April 13, 2023
Arrest of Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez (kd) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez (kd) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez (1). (kd) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez: Initial Appearance set for 4/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. [ Interpreter Needed ](kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 04/13/2023 as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez. (khs) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez. Attorney Sarah M. Gorman for Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez added. (cl) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarah M. Gorman appearing for Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez (Gorman, Sarah) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
6 6 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 4/13/23 as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez. (kd) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
8 8 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Initial Appearance as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez held on 4/14/2023. Related [+] (Interpreter: Humberto Orive) (cl) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-] cording Info: RIO GRANDE @ 9:46 AM
9 9 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (cl) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 4/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (cl) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Pirkovic, Mindy) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
11 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez. (eh) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
13 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez held; defendant detained. Related [+] (Interpreter: H. Orive) (khs) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar (khs) [1:23-mj-00655-JMR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
Judge update in case as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez. District Judge James O. Browning added. (kd)
Related: [-]
16 16 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Heriberto Marquez-Nevarez. (eh)
Related: [-]