Original Case: 1:21-cv-03320

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01181
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 03, 2024 3:21 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
GAF MATERIALS, LLC, DBA GAF
Represented By
Nancy L. Cohen
Cohen Black Law
contact info
Nicole Marie Black
Cohen Black Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GOLD PEAK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By
Lisa S. Greenberg
Pearson Legal
contact info
Igor Raykin
Kishinevsky & Raykin
contact info
Matthew R. Pearson
Pearson Legal, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 02 2024
[11125545] Affirmed;Terminated on the merits after oral hearing;Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Matheson, Kelly and Eid (authoring). Mandate to issue. [23-1181]

Docket last updated: 10/03/2024 3:21 AM MDT
Thursday, May 25, 2023
[11001643] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/25/2023. Docketing statement, transcript order form, notice of appearance and disclosure statement due 06/08/2023 for Gold Peak Homeowners Association, Inc. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 06/08/2023 for GAF Materials, LLC. 23-1181
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil