Original Case: 1:22-cv-02413

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01182
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 14, 2024 2:38 AM MST
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Archis Ashok Parasharami
Mayer Brown
contact info
Jennifer B. Dickey
U.S. Chamber Litigation Center
contact info
Jonathan D. Urick
U.S. Chamber Litigation Center
contact info
Daniel Jones
Mayer Brown
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
FLOWERS FOODS, INC., a Georgia limited liability company
Represented By
Jared Lee Palmer
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Matthew W. Lampe
Jones Day
contact info
Traci L. Lovitt
Jones Day
contact info
David Lee Zwisler
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
FLOWERS BAKERIES, LLC, a Georgia limited liability company
Represented By
Jared Lee Palmer
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Matthew W. Lampe
Jones Day
contact info
Traci L. Lovitt
Jones Day
contact info
David Lee Zwisler
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF DENVER, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company
Represented By
Jared Lee Palmer
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Matthew W. Lampe
Jones Day
contact info
Traci L. Lovitt
Jones Day
contact info
David Lee Zwisler
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANGELO BROCK, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Shaun A. Markley
Nicholas & Tomasevic
contact info
Wadi Muhaisen
Muhaisen & Muhaisen
contact info
Craig M. Nicholas
Nicholas & Tomasevic
contact info
Alex M. Tomasevic
Nicholas & Tomasevic
contact info

GPO Nov 12 2024
[11135562] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Phillips (author). Mandate to issue. [23-1182]

Docket last updated: 11/14/2024 2:38 AM MST
Thursday, May 25, 2023
[11001662] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/25/2023 Docketing statement due 06/08/2023 for Flowers Bakeries, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denver, LLC and Flowers Foods, Inc. Transcript order form due 06/08/2023 for Flowers Bakeries, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denver, LLC and Flowers Foods, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 06/08/2023 for Angelo Brock, Flowers Bakeries, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denver, LLC and Flowers Foods, Inc. Disclosure statement due on 06/08/2023 for Flowers Bakeries, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denver, LLC and Flowers Foods, Inc. 23-1182
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil