Chaisson v. USA
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00540
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-usc-10551 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 2:48 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dennis J. Chaisson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lisa M. Bulthaup, Husband and Wife, each Individually and the Marital Community Comprised Thereof
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 08 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-10551 Affirmed ] Judge: WED , Judge: CTW , Judge: ICR Mandate issue date is 03/01/2024 [23-10551] |
Docket last updated: 01/10/2024 2:48 AM CST |
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
4 pgs US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa M. Bulthaup and Mr. Dennis J. Chaisson 23-10551 (AS) |