Original Case: 4:20-cv-01326

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcd-10552
Typeprivate civil diversity / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2024 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Landon Capital Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By
Travis S. Gamble
Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.
contact info
David Charles Kent
Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ICON EV, L.L.C.
Represented By
Court L. Fernald
Englander & Fischer, L.L.P.
contact info
John Michael Frick
Reid & Dennis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NexGen Lithium Batteries, L.L.C.
Represented By
John Michael Frick
Reid & Dennis, P.C.
contact info
Courtney Fernald
Englander Fischer, P.A.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Landon Capital Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By
Daniel Alexander Harrell
Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.
contact info
Travis S. Gamble
Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.
contact info
David Charles Kent
Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ancor Holdings, L.P., By and through its general partner, Ancor Partner, Incorporated
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Travis
Travis Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Ancor Holdings, L.P., By and through its general partner, Ancor Partner, Incorporated
Represented By
Marshall Smiland
Travis & Inman, P.C.
contact info
Jared Inman
Travis & Inman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey M. Travis
Travis Law Group
contact info
Katelynn Hickey
Travis & Inman, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2024
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-10552 Affirmed in Part ] Judge: EBC , Judge: KDE , Judge: CTW Mandate issue date is 09/16/2024 [23-10552]

Docket last updated: 08/26/2024 3:37 AM CDT
Friday, May 26, 2023
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ancor Holdings, L.P. 23-10552 (AS)
Related: [-]