Monden v. Con Nuclear Security
Original Case: 2:22-cv-00004
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-pcd-10553 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 10:56 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Consolidated Nuclear Security, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Stephen Cobey Monden
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 08 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-10553 Affirmed ] Judge: EHJ, Judge: JLD, Judge: DMD Mandate issue date is 04/01/2024 [23-10553] |
Docket last updated: 03/11/2024 10:56 AM CDT |
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Stephen Cobey Monden 23-10553 (RSM) |