Caceres v. Preload
Original Case: 2:21-cv-03834
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-pcd-30354 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 2:21 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Preload, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Edilberto Caceres
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 17 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-30354 Affirmed] udge: JLD, Judge: JWE, Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 12/11/2023. [23-30354] |
Docket last updated: 11/21/2023 2:21 AM CST |
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Edilberto Caceres 23-30354 (WMJ) |