Original Case: 3:21-cv-00460

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-ss-30355
Typesocial security / united states
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2023 8:43 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By
Justin Jack
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Jose Ricardo Hernandez
Social Security Administration
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Tiffany Latres' Stamper
Represented By
Tiffany Latres' Stamper
contact info

GPO Oct 19 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-30355 Affirmed] Judge: JLW, Judge: CES, Judge: DMD. Mandate issue date is 12/11/2023. [23-30355]

Docket last updated: 10/20/2023 8:43 AM CDT
Friday, May 26, 2023
SOCIAL SECURITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Tiffany Latres' Stamper 23-30355 (WMJ)
Related: [-]