Original Case: 1:21-cv-03566

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcf-30356
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 10:40 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Flowers Foods, Incorporated
Represented By
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Kevin Hishta
Ogletree Deakins, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. Lampe
Jones Day
contact info
Margaret Santen
Ogletree Deakins, P.C.
contact info
Traci Leigh Lovitt
Jones Day
contact info
Matthew J. Rubenstein
Jones Day
contact info
Andrew John Halverson
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Flowers Baking Company of Baton Rouge, L.L.C.
Represented By
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Kevin Hishta
Ogletree Deakins, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. Lampe
Jones Day
contact info
Margaret Santen
Ogletree Deakins, P.C.
contact info
Traci Leigh Lovitt
Jones Day
contact info
Matthew J. Rubenstein
Jones Day
contact info
Andrew John Halverson
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joseph Ash
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Ryan Moore Goudelocke
Goudelocke Law
contact info
Steven G. Durio
Durio McGoffin Stagg & Guidry
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Justin Bolton
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Ryan Moore Goudelocke
Goudelocke Law
contact info
Steven G. Durio
Durio McGoffin Stagg & Guidry
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Matthew Crawford
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Ryan Moore Goudelocke
Goudelocke Law
contact info
Steven G. Durio
Durio McGoffin Stagg & Guidry
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-30356 Affirmed ] Judge: JLW, Judge: CH, Judge: SAH Mandate issue date is 04/19/2024 [23-30356]

Docket last updated: 04/01/2024 10:40 AM CDT
Friday, May 26, 2023
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph Ash, Mr. Justin Bolton and Mr. Matthew Crawford 23-30356 (CAG)
Related: [-]