Original Case: 2:20-cv-00827

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcd-30357
Typeprivate civil diversity / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 5:47 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Weeks Marine, Incorporated
Represented By
Richard Biddle Ehret
Boykin & Utley
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Federal Insurance Company, Chubb
Represented By
Richard Biddle Ehret
Boykin & Utley
contact info
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Weeks Marine, Incorporated
Represented By
Michael H. Payne
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
Ryan Joseph Boonstra
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
Richard Biddle Ehret
Boykin & Utley
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Keiland Construction, L.L.C.
Represented By
Christopher K. LeMieux
Riess LeMieux, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Keiland Construction, L.L.C.
Represented By
Christopher K. LeMieux
Riess LeMieux, L.L.C.
contact info
Johanna E. Lambert
Riess LeMieux, L.L.C.
contact info
Mary Claire O'Brien Kramer
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart Moore & Daniels, L.L.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2024
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-30357 Affirmed ] Judge: DRW , Judge: CTW , Judge: ICR Mandate issue date is 08/16/2024 [23-30357]

Docket last updated: 07/26/2024 5:47 AM CDT
Friday, May 26, 2023
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Keiland Construction, L.L.C. 23-30357 (CAG)
Related: [-]