New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Justin T Quinn
Case #: 3:23-cv-02949
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 4:32 AM EST
Defendant
JOHN DOES
Defendant
KYLE EDMONDS
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Defendant
DYLAN ELY
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT FERIELLO
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS GURBA
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Defendant
GEORGE KOKINAKOUS
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL MACMAHON
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF HILLSBOROUGH
Represented By
RICHARD J. GUSS
Difrancesco Bateman Coley Yospin Kunzman Davis & Lehrer
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN ELIZABETH CHIN
Represented By
STEPHEN PATRICK BURKE, JR
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wikstrom & Sinins, P.C.
contact info
LAUREN GOODFELLOW
Javerbaum Wurgaft
contact info
MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wikstrom &sinins
contact info
STANLEY O. KING
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wikstrom & Sinins, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
THE ESTATE OF PATRICK CHIN
Represented By
STEPHEN PATRICK BURKE, JR
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wikstrom & Sinins, P.C.
contact info
STANLEY O. KING
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wikstrom & Sinins, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
61 61 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/15 4:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Parties' request to extend the fact and expert deadlines is granted. Fact discovery shall be completed by July 21, 2025. Expert discovery shall be completed by January 16, 2026. Magistrate Judge Quinn will conduct a telephone status conference on July 14, 2025 at 3:30PM. Counsel for Defendants shall arrange the call and contact the Court once all counsel have joined the line (609-989-2144). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 4/15/2025. (eh, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/15 4:37 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/15/2025. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
60 60 misc Status Report Fri 04/11 4:27 PM
STATUS REPORT by KYLE EDMONDS, DYLAN ELY, ROBERT FERIELLO, THOMAS GURBA, GEORGE KOKINAKOUS, MICHAEL MACMAHON, TOWNSHIP OF HILLSBOROUGH. (GUSS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
59 59 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/09 2:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting58 letter request. The next telephone status conference is adjourned to 4/15/2025 at 11:00am. Counsel for plaintiff is to setup and initiate the call to chambers - 609-989-2144.The parties are to submit a joint status report by 4/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 4/9/2025. (eh, )
Related: [-]