Durando et al v. Bhatnagar
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Brendan Abell Hurson |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-01462 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Anshu Bhatnagar
509 Bonnibelle Place
Rockville, MD 20850 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Congregation Chazon Avrohom
196 Enclave Blvd
Lakeside, NJ 08701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Durando
43 Alexander Ave.
Nutley, NJ 07110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC
5624 17TH Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11204 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Correspondence from Clerk re: Local Rule 101.2 (c/m def 10/4/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
24 | 24
![]() SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 10/4/2024. (c/m def 10/4/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting22 Defendant's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Michael Moeller, Jr and Jeffrey M Schwaber terminated. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 10/4/2024. (c/m def 10/4/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anshu Bhatnagar(Moeller, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
order
Order
Fri 06/28 12:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anshu Bhatnagar in light of20 Status Report filed by Anshu Bhatnagar. Should the settlement noted in20 Status Report not be consummated, counsel may refile the motion. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 6/28/2024. (nd4s, Chambers) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Anshu Bhatnagar(Moeller, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Congregation Chazon Avrohom, Karen Durando, Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC(Preston, Anne) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Wrong Case
Thu 03/21 8:12 AM
QC NOTICE: Documents for17 Status Report filed by Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC, Congregation Chazon Avrohom, Karen Durando were filed in the wrong case and need to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed: **Case caption and number do not match. Please correct case case caption on filing and refile. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Congregation Chazon Avrohom, Karen Durando, Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC(Preston, Anne) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Anshu Bhatnagar(Moeller, Joseph) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/20 2:03 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STATUS REPORT by Karen Durando(Preston, Anne) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 09/21 9:03 AM
QC NOTICE:13 Status Report Submitted filed by Martin Smiley was filed incorrectly. **DO NOT SPREAD TEXT WHEN DOCKETING IN RELATED CASES. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Status Report Submitted by Martin Smiley Associated Cases: 8:20-cv-02633-DLB, 8:23-cv-01462-DLB(Preston, Anne) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anshu Bhatnagar.(Schwaber, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE by Congregation Chazon Avrohom, Karen Durando, Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC re9 Response in Opposition to Motion Proposed Order (Costello, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Congregation Chazon Avrohom, Karen Durando, Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC.(Costello, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 08/21 10:58 AM
QC NOTICE:9 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC, Congregation Chazon Avrohom, Karen Durando was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to 9 . (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Anshu Bhatnagar(Schwaber, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Moeller, Jr on behalf of Anshu Bhatnagar (Moeller, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Schwaber on behalf of Anshu Bhatnagar (Schwaber, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
order
Order
Wed 06/21 1:13 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to submit a proposed motion to dismiss briefing schedule by June 28 and to submit a joint status report regarding the state court litigation on September 20 and every 90 days after that. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 6/21/2023. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 06/20 11:50 AM
Telephone Conference re: status held on 6/20/2023 before Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (rc2s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
order
Order
Thu 06/08 6:25 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling a status call in Smiley v. Bhatnagar, DLB 20-2633 and Durando v. Bhatnagar, 23-1462 for Tuesday, June 20, 2023 at 11 a.m. My chambers will circulate call-in information. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 6/8/2023. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/07 12:32 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Judge Peter J. Messitte no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC (Preston, Anne) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued 21 days as to Anshu Bhatnagar. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
Deficiency Notice
Thu 06/01 9:26 AM
Deficiency Notice for Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/8/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BMDDC-10630376.), filed by Eagle Strategic Advisers, LLC, Karen Durando, Congregation Chazon Avrohom.(Preston, Anne) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |