Rodney McClure, et al v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Store Inc
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00334
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01983 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 30, 2023 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORE INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LOVES TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORE INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RODNEY MCCLURE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DOROTHY SWINT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/30/2023 4:38 AM EDT |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Rodney McClure and Dorothy Swint in District Court No. 1-21-cv-00334. (SB) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 20 pgs District Court Memorandum | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs District Court Judgment | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
17 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Daniel L. Sammel, Esq., Patrick J. Murphy, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/14/2023. (SB) |