Original Case: 1:22-cv-05387

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01996
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 10, 2024 3:32 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
WALMART STORES EAST INC, doing business as Walmart Inc
Represented By
Christopher J. Moran
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Tracey E. Diamond
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Leigh H. McMonigle
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Misha Tseytlin
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SAMS EAST INC, Sams Club Fulfillment Center
Represented By
Christopher J. Moran
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Tracey E. Diamond
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Leigh H. McMonigle
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Misha Tseytlin
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ERICK ZANETICH, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated
Represented By
Justin L. Swidler
Swartz Swidler
contact info

GPO Dec 09 2024
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: JORDAN, PHIPPS and FREEMAN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 53. Judge: PHIPPS Authoring, Judge: FREEMAN Concurring & dissenting.

Docket last updated: 12/10/2024 3:32 AM EST
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Erick Zanetich in District Court No. 1-22-cv-05387. (CJG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 21 pgs District Court Opinion 05/25/23
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order 05/25/23
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
17 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Justin L. Swidler, Esq., Tracey E. Diamond, Esq., Leigh H. McMonigle, Esq., Christopher J. Moran, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/14/2023. (CJG)
Related: [-]