Original Case: 3:22-cv-00714

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cr-10566
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2024 4:35 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
City of Dallas, Texas
Represented By
Nicholas Dane Palmer
City Attorney's Office
contact info
John Cheves Ligon
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jabari Demaun Howard
Represented By
Sarah Elizabeth Delaney
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jason Scott Webb
Represented By
Nicholas Dane Palmer
City Attorney's Office
contact info
John Cheves Ligon
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Stephanie Mitchell-Huff
Represented By
Courtney Corbello
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Texas
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Pamela Griffin
Represented By
John Martin Lynch
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Griffin & Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By
John Martin Lynch
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jayson Howard Moore
Represented By
Jayson Howard Moore
contact info

GPO Mar 04 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-10566 Affirmed ] Judge: CES , Judge: SKD , Judge: KDE Mandate issue date is 03/26/2024 [23-10566]

Docket last updated: 03/05/2024 4:35 AM CST
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jayson Howard Moore 23-10566 (CAS)
Related: [-]