Town of Weldon v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02350 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 4:23-cv-00075 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Town of Weldon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Reissued
Fri 06/09 12:33 PM
Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
15 | 15 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Eastern (associated as of 5/31/2023), 4:23-cv-00075, Town of Weldon v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02350-RMG (sshe, ) | |
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 06/01 10:22 AM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 4:23-cv-00075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 06/01 10:57 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Eastern (associated as of 5/31/2023), 4:23-cv-00075, Town of Weldon v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02350-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 134). Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/24/2023. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, filed by Robert J. Shaughnessy. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
10 | 10 Letter from Melanie Black Dubis regarding entry of appearance pending issue of transfer. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
9 | 9 Letter from Charles E. Raynal, IV regarding entry of appearance pending issue of transfer. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendants shall have until the 28th day after such disposition by the JPML to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 5/11/2023. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard Chemicals, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel, Kris Gardner of Tharrington Smith, LLP at 150 Fayetteville St., Suite 1800, Raleigh, NC 27601; Scott Summy of Baron & Budd, P.C. at 3102 Oak Lawn Ave., Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219; Melanie B. Dubis & Charles Raynal of Parker Poe Adams & Bernstien LLP at 301 Fayetteville St., Suite 400, Raleigh, NC 27601; John Wellschlager of DLA Piper LLP (US) at The Marbury Builing, 6224 Smith Ave., Baltimore, MD 21209-3600; Daniel L. Ring & Tyler D. Alfermann of Mayer Brown LLP at 71 South Wacker Dr., Chicago, IL 60606; Michael L. Carpenter of Gray Layton Kersh Solomon Furr & Smith, P.A. at Post Office Box 2636, Gastonia, NC 28053-2636; Peter Condron of Crowell & Moring at 1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Washington, D.C. 20004-259; Jonathan Handler, Keith H. Bensten of Day Pitney LLP at One Federal St., 29th Floor, Boston, MA 02110; Heidi Levine of Sidley Austin LLP at One South Dearborn Street, Chicago, IL 60603; Jonathan Blakley of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani at One North Franklin, Suite 800, Chicago, IL 60606; John Parker & Oliver Twaddell of Goldberg Segalla LLP at 711 Third Ave., Suite 1900, New York, NY 10017; Kat Hacker of Bartlit Beck LLP at 1801 Wewatta, Suite 1200, Denver, CO 80202; Kurt G. Warner, Clifton L. Brinson & Addie K.S. Ries of Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan, L.L.P. at Post Office Box 2611, Raleigh, NC 27611; David R. Erickson & Brent Dwerlkotte of Shook, Hardy, & Bacon, L.L.P. at 2555 Grand Blvd., Kansas City, MO 64108; Kurt D. Weaver of Womble Bond Dickson (US) LLP at 555 Faytteville St., Suite 1100, Raleigh, NC 27601; Keith E. Smith of Greenberg Traurig, LLP at Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch St., Suite 400, Philadelphia, PA 19103; Ethan R. Ware of William Mullen at P. O. Box 8116, Columbia, SC 29202; Angus Fire Armour Corporation, c/o The Prentice-Hall Corp. System, Inc. at 251 Little Falls Drive, Wilmington, DE 19808 and The Ansul Company, c/o CT Corporation at 1999 Bryan St., Suite 900, Dallas, TX 75201 mailed via US Mail on May 4, 2023. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Notice filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP regarding1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) . (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
4 | 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chemguard Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Chemguard Inc.. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
2 | 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Blake on behalf of Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP from Halifax County Superior, case number 23-CVS-199. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7069111), filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Halifax Co. 23-cvs-199 filings, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |