Original Case: 1:21-cv-03047

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01186
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Jun 28, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jun 29, 2023 2:41 AM MDT
Defendant
TERRENCE DANIEL O'BRIEN
Represented By
Terrence Daniel O'Brien
contact info
Movant - Appellant
REED BOONE O'BRIEN
Represented By
Reed Boone O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
IRA B. DOLE
Represented By
Nicholas Harris Gower
Hoskin Farina & Kampf
contact info
David A. Price
Hoskin Farina & Kampf
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SARAH M. DOLE
Represented By
Nicholas Harris Gower
Hoskin Farina & Kampf
contact info
David A. Price
Hoskin Farina & Kampf
contact info

GPO Jun 28 2023
[11009460] Frap 42;Procedural termination without judicial action;Clerk of the Court. [23-1186]

Docket last updated: 06/29/2023 2:41 AM MDT
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
[11002776] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 05/31/2023. 23-1186
Related: [-]
[11002714] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/31/2023. Fee or ifp forms due 06/30/2023 for Reed Boone O'Brien. Notice of appearance due on 06/14/2023 for Ira B. Dole and Sarah M. Dole, and Notice of appearance due on 06/30/2023 for Reed Boone O'Brien. 23-1186
Related: [-]
Att: 1 72 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se
2 pgs [11002962] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 07/10/2023 for Reed Boone O'Brien. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/21/2023. 23-1186
Related: [-]
[11002971] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4, Comments: Volumes 1-3 pleadings, Volume 4-transcripts. 23-1186
Related: [-]
Att: 1 64 pgs Volume I Pleadings
Att: 2 357 pgs Volume II Pleadings
Att: 3 201 pgs Volume III Pleadings
Att: 4 415 pgs Volume IV Transcripts