T.S. v. Commissioner, SSA
Original Case: 1:21-cv-01102
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01187 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 3:45 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER, SSA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
T.S., on behalf of a minor child, R.U.S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/17/2024 3:45 AM MDT |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
[11002756] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/31/2023. Docketing statement due 06/14/2023 for T.S.. Transcript order form due 06/14/2023 for T.S.. Notice of appearance due on 06/14/2023 for Commissioner, SSA and T.S. 23-1187 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |