Palani Karupaiyan, et al v. Arnaud Vaissie, et al
Original Case: 2:22-cv-03083
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01948 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2024 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
KAPITAL DATA CORP
|
|
Defendant
KUMAR MANGALA
|
|
Defendant
KARUPAIYAN CONSULTING INC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
KUMAR MANGALA, Individually and in their Official Capacity as Founder and CEO of the Kapital Data Corp.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
INTERNATIONAL SOS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY HARRIS, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Team Leader, Mobile Apploications of the International SOS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KARUPAIYAN CONSULTING INC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
KAPITAL DATA CORP
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MIKE WEISTEIN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Principal, Product Engineering of Access Staffing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ACCESS STAFFING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DESSI NIKOLOVA, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Director, Product Engineering of the International SOS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ARNAUD VAISSIE, Individually and in his official capacity as CEO of Isos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PALANI KARUPAIYAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
R. P.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
P. P.
|
|
Plaintiff - dismissed_USCA
P. P.
|
|
Plaintiff - dismissed_USCA
R. P.
|
GPO
Feb 07 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: JORDAN, PHIPPS and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 5. [23-1948, 23-2946]. |
Docket last updated: 02/08/2024 3:56 AM EST |
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Palani Karupaiyan, P. P. and R. P. in District Court No. 2-22-cv-03083. (SB) | ||
Att: 1 11 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs OSEI ORDER SENT Palani Karupaiyan has filed a notice of appeal on behalf of himself and his minor children, R.P. and P.P. The notice of appeal will be docketed as to these individuals pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 3(c)(2). It is noted that a person who is not a licensed attorney may only represent himself in this Court. See 28 U.S.C. § 1654; see also Osei-Afriye v. The Medical College of Pennsylvania, 937 F.2d 876 (3d Cir. 1991) (non-lawyer appearing pro se may not act as attorney for minor child or incompetent). A non-attorney parent must be represented by counsel to the extent the parent brings an action to pursue claims on behalf of his or her child. Palani Karupaiyan does not appear to be a licensed attorney. Accordingly, this action will proceed only as to the parent unless an appearance by counsel is entered within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. In addition, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 (made applicable by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 25(a)(5)) and Third Circuit Local Appellate Rule 113.12, personal identifier information must be redacted from filings. These identifiers include Social Security numbers, names of minor children, financial account numbers, dates of birth, and home addresses in criminal cases. Litigants are responsible for redacting documents. This Court’s Local Appellate Rules and a link to the Judicial Conference Policy are available at www.ca3.uscourts.gov. Accordingly, this action has been docketed under the initials of the minor children Appellants, rather than their full names. The parties should comply with these privacy rules. The Clerk will not review each filing for compliance. This order has no impact on any filings in the District Court, and the parties should address any issues regarding those filings with that Court. (SB) |