ROSS, SR. v. ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Evelyn Padin |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03122 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 6:39 AM EST |
Defendant
HONORABLE ARTHUR BATISTA, J.S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BARBARA FEINBERG, ESQ.
|
|
Defendant
HONORABLE DAVID KATZ, J.S.C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONORABLE JODI ROSENBERG, J.S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONORABLE SHARIFA R. SALAAM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONORABLE LOUISE G. SPENCER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONORABLE RICHARD SULES, J.S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONORABLE SHEILA VENABLE, J.S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR.
634 EAGLE ROCK AVENUE #7018
WEST ORANGE, NJ 07052 |
GPO
Jul 31 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/31/2023. (dam) |
|
GPO
Jun 12 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 6/12/2024. (mxw, ) |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned)
Fri 07/19 1:21 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2315 for14 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR.. USCA Case Manager Kirsi (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3kr) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia)
Thu 07/18 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to13 Order,12 Opinion by HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR. Plaintiff was granted IFP status on 7/28/2023. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (adc) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/12 4:59 PM
ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with prejudice; closing the case. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 6/12/2024. (mxw, )(n.m.) |
|
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 06/12 4:58 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 6/12/2024. (mxw, ) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 03/14 8:33 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Evelyn Padin for all further proceedings. Judge Kevin McNulty no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/14/24. (ak, ) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/11 6:33 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HONORABLE ARTHUR BATISTA, J.S.C., ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, BARBARA FEINBERG, ESQ., HONORABLE DAVID KATZ, J.S.C, HONORABLE JODI ROSENBERG, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHARIFA R. SALAAM, HONORABLE LOUISE G. SPENCER, HONORABLE RICHARD SULES, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHEILA VENABLE, J.S.C., filed by HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR.(ECF Help Desk) (dam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/01 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT against HONORABLE ARTHUR BATISTA, J.S.C., ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, BARBARA FEINBERG, ESQ., HONORABLE DAVID KATZ, J.S.C, HONORABLE JODI ROSENBERG, J.S.C., HONORABLE RICHARD SULES, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHEILA VENABLE, J.S.C. with JURY DEMAND filed by HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR. (ECF Help Desk) (dam) |
|
qc
QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney
Fri 09/01 10:48 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The9 Complaint submitted by HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR. on 9/1/2023 does not contain a proper signature. Please be advised that only Registered Users and Attorneys are permitted to electronically sign documents with an s/ . PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED OR WET SIGNATURE . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/15 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR on behalf of HONORABLE ARTHUR BATISTA, J.S.C., ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, HONORABLE DAVID KATZ, J.S.C, HONORABLE JODI ROSENBERG, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHARIFA R. SALAAM, HONORABLE LOUISE G. SPENCER, HONORABLE RICHARD SULES, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHEILA VENABLE, J.S.C. (SINDEL, THOMAS) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 07/31 1:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING the Complaint. This dismissal is without prejudice to the submission, within thirty (30) days, of a proposed amended complaint that remedies these deficiencies. If no such proposed amended complaint is timely filed, this dismissal shall become one with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/31/2023. (dam) |
|
6 | 6
4
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 07/31 1:54 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/31/2023. (dam) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/28 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT, see1 , against HONORABLE ARTHUR BATISTA, J.S.C., ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, BARBARA FEINBERG, ESQ., HONORABLE DAVID KATZ, J.S.C, HONORABLE JODI ROSENBERG, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHARIFA R. SALAAM, HONORABLE LOUISE G. SPENCER, HONORABLE RICHARD SULES, J.S.C., HONORABLE SHEILA VENABLE, J.S.C. with JURY DEMAND filed by HAROLD ANTHONY ROSS, SR.(dam) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/28 3:04 PM
ORDER granting (ECF No.1 -2) Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Application; directing the Clerk of the Court to file the Complaint; STAYING the issuance of Summons and Service pending screening. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/28/2023. (dam) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 07/28 10:09 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kevin McNulty for all further proceedings. Judge Claire C. Cecchi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/27/23. (ak, ) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers
Thu 06/08 11:58 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (krg, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Thu 06/08 11:54 AM
Complaint Received. (krg, ) (krg, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Application IFP, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Consent & Registration to Receive NEFs, | ||
Att: 5 Envelope | ||
Att: 6 (6/8/2023) Notice of Motion, | ||
Att: 7 (6/8/2023) Certificate of Service |