Link et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02774 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 2:23-cv-02635 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2023 6:04 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Keith Acton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Ahrens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Akina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Arrasmith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Baker, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Bastian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrian Baum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loyd Belgarde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Blackman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Bobbitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stevie Bonds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Bosch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bossard, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Bowers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James G. Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Brownell, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Brubaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Bryan, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Bundy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Burbank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noberto Cantu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Cardoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Carmona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Cerasani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Chapman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Clarkson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Claro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Connelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Corey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Cornell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Crisler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Crochet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrel Crutchfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Cunningham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Curtis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul D'Adamo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Davison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Day
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Dick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Dillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Dionne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Doane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delano Dobson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Donahoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Donnelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Dryden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Enquist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Errico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Estes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Evans, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Everitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fealy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Federer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Ferebee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion Paul Fitch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Forkey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Fox, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerard Fraher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byron Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Fryar, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Garner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Geiman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conrad Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TF Greeson, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Gregg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlford Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Hagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rickey Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Harris, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Herring
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hinnen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Huberty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hultman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Otis Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Jolly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Jung
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kapololu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Kasler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kassouf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Kirkbride
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Kirkland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Krick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Kuebler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Laiviar, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lamey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Larry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Lee, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Lee, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Link, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Lloyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Lock-Alcorn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Lovic, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Maclean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Mahaffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Marchesani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Markel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rudy Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Mason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Mccarty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Mcclellan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Mees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chet Melton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Menegay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Mizell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Moller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Montalbano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicky Monteith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Montenero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jinimy Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Moseley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Mosher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dewayne Muhammad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Munger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Neece
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Newcomb, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James North
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Nutall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher O'Connor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randell Octave
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abel Olivas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aoese Oto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl Page
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eldon Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Partenheimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Pecoraro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Pendleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Penney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Petralia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Archie Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willem Potman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Prawl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Prentice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Pullen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Rafus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Raughton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Redding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orlando Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Riccio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Richard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Rihel, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Robertson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Robertson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cox Robin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Robinson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hollis Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Roll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rugenski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Rulon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Rummell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Schermerhorn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Schmaltz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Schroeder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Sewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford Shafer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmie Shelton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Sizemore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Sluder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion Smalls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Snell, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Sondgeroth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Spina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald St. Mary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Stallworth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Stoll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Strickland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Swanson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Thene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Thornton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Thurman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Thurmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Tiiviothy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Tullar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Turman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Urquhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cruz Urtado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Van-Hook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ferdinand Vitek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Wade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calvin Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Wall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Waller, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cedric Walton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lord Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Weber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Webster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Weirich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colission Wells
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Whisenant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evan White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Wilberger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Wilson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Winner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Winner, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malcolm Woodridge, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Wren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Zielinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 09/16 5:34 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: The motion to amend (Dkt. No. 6104 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (5) in case 2:21-cv-02389-RMG; (5) in case 2:21-cv-02456-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-00491-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-02427-RMG; (29) in case 2:23-cv-02774-RMG; (32) in case 2:24-cv-00212-RMG; (24) in case 2:24-cv-02108-RMG) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file the amended complaints. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/16/2024. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 09/10 4:31 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Multiple Complaints by Richard Leivas, Kevin Leuer, Danny McKinnon on Dembroe, et al, and by Brendan Tucker, Christopher Whitfield, Alan Dembroe Et al., Tommy Leach, Sr, Arthur Spina, Brandon Barrette, Alfred Young, Steven Varricchio. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B-1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C-1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit D-1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit E Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit E-1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit F Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit F-1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit G Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit G-1 Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/26 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Stein, Neal Bell, James Catalano, Stephen Croxford, George Derk, Glenn Dietz, Wayne Gould, James K. Johnson, Flavio Jurado, David Key, John Mauldin, Walter Mikell, Luis Pedroza, James Randolph, Thomas Shores, Daniel Vaughan, Ronald Wagner, David Button, Gary Hawkins, Tena Tarver, Alan Dembroe Et al., James Winston, Joseph Arcuri, John Carr, Patrick Cornell, Terry Lee, Sr., Anthony Marchesani, Steven Partenheimer, Michael Sparks, Larry Van-Hook, William Bretherton, Donald Krumanacker, Gerald Beal, John Patch, Peter LeCompte , and Alan Dembroe, et al as to only plaintiffs Dion Burleson, Sean Gilchrist, David Hildreth, Gary Jackson, Donald Jones, Rhonda Knowles, William Maney, Philip Moffitt, Mark Molitor, Steven Passow, Nicholas Principe, Douglas Williams, Darryl Wright, Oliver Wright.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/25 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darrel Crutchfield, George Libbey, Alan Dembroe Et al. as to plaintiff Howard MontaigneAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG, 2:24-cv-00212-RMG, 2:24-cv-02108-RMG(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/15 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Sondgeroth, Lawrence Stallworth, Gregory Stoll, Gary Swanson, Mark Thene, Joseph Thornton, Kenneth Thurman, Ronald Urquhart, Cruz Urtado, Ferdinand Vitek, Milton Wade, Johnny Walker, Kenneth Walker, Frank Wall, Charles Waller, Jr., Cedric Walton, Lord Watkins, Wayne Watkins, Matthew Weber, Gary Webster, Colission Wells, Bruce Whisenant, Donald White, Evan White, Brian Wilberger, Craig Williams, Richard Wilson, William Wilson, James Wilson, Jr., David Winner, Leroy Winner, Jr., William Wren, Robert Wright, Brian Wyatt, Joel Zielinski, Timothy ZimmermanAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/15 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry Miles, Norman Mitchell, Robert Moller, Nicky Monteith, John Montenero, Willie Moseley, Robert Mosher, Dewayne Muhammad, James Munger, Ricky Neece, Gregory Nichols, Benjamin Nutall, Christopher O'Connor, Randell Octave, Abel Olivas, Karl Page, Eldon Parker, James Penney, Archie Porter, Willem Potman, Reginald Prawl, Mark Prentice, Steven Raughton, Richard Redding, Michael Reynolds, Orlando Reynolds, Stephen Riccio, Michael Richard, Robert Richards, Robert Rihel, Jr., Richard Robertson, Ronald Robertson, Timothy Robinson, Leslie Robinson, Jr., Rodney Roll, Michael Rugenski, Peter Rulon, Philip Schermerhorn, Daniel Schroeder, Richard Scott, Bobby Sewell, Clifford Shafer, Jimmie Shelton, Matthew Simmons, Dean Sizemore, Richard Sluder, Marion Smalls, Anthony Smith, Paul Smith, Jeremiah Snell, Sr.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/12 6:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Scott Forkey, Gordon Foster, Frederick Fox, II, Gerard Fraher, Byron Freeman, Willie Fryar, Jr., Richard Garner, Donald Geiman, Donald Gilbert, Conrad Gonzalez, Larry Greene, TF Greeson, III, William Gregg, Carlford Griffin, Randy Hagan, Kenneth Hall, Rickey Hall, Charles Hamilton, Ronald Harper, Oscar Harris, Jr., Frank Harrison, Rick Harrison, Larry Herring, Michael Hinnen, Paul Huberty, Donald Hudson, Robert Hudson, John Hultman, Alan James, Jesse Johnson, Otis Johnson, Richard Jung, John Kapololu, James Kasler, John Kassouf, Robert Kerr, William Krick, Harold Kuebler, John Lamey, Bruce Larry, Joseph Lee, Jr., Shane Lewis, John Link, Jr, Warren Lloyd, Larry Lock-Alcorn, Robert Maclean, Curtis Markel, Rudy Martin, Raymond Mees, Robert MenegayAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/12 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Keith Acton, Dennis Ahrens, Roy Akina, William Bailey, Jack Baker, Jr., David Bastian, Michael Bauer, Adrian Baum, Loyd Belgarde, Gerald Bennett, Thomas Blackman, George Bobbitt, Stevie Bonds, James Bosch, John Bossard, Jr., Dennis Bowers, Carl Brown, David Brown, George Brown, James G. Brown, James Brown, Ryan Brown, James Brownell, Sr., Joseph Brubaker, Larry Bundy, William Burbank, Harold Cardoza, William Carpenter, Herbert Chandler, David Clark, Dean Claro, David Corey, Ronald Crisler, Earl Crochet, Earl Curtis, Frank Day, William Dillon, David Dionne, David Doane, Delano Dobson, Kevin Donnelly, Mark Enquist, Andrew Errico, Charles Estes, Gregory Evans, Sr., Walter Everitt, John Fealy, Marion Paul Fitch, Cox Robin , Edward ChrismanAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Stag on behalf of John Link, Jr Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG(Stag, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/23 12:47 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Merritt E Cunningham on behalf of John Link, Jr Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02774-RMG(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 06/20 3:51 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey (associated as of 6/20/2023), 2:23-cv-02635, Link et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02774-RMG NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 26, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE / NOTICE (s) and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference will be In-Person (absent further Order from the Court) set for 7/14/2023 9:00 AM. The conference will be conducted in Charleston Courtroom #1, U. S. Court House, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (A dial-in, listen only, number will also be available). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 06/20 3:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:23-cv-02635. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (MDL 2873 CTO 135 In Re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation - Judge Richard M. Gergel) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/20/2023.] | |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information for plaintiff was not included for all parties at time of filing; Caption of case did not correctly include party names; Disclosure Statement not included at time of filing; Neither the names of 255 plaintiff parties, nor their representation; nor the names of 52 defendant parties were included by filing counsel at time of filing . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. ***Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases.*** (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/20/2023.] | ||
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/20/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/20/2023.] | ||
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (CAMERSON, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/20/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MRS-L-0566-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14317978), filed by 3M COMPANY.(CAMERSON, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/20/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |