Acosta et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02775 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Washington Eastern, 1:23-cv-03068 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2023 6:04 AM EST |
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to the Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Landon Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Rafn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Vogel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill Rafn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lance Ostrom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darik Rochon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonia Serrano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Ostrom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenna Vogel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Vargas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Vargas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Vandenheuvel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evelyn Vandenheuvel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Valencia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Werst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audomaro Valencia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cory Slobig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Slobig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Smoot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Boster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudio Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Acosta, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilena Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicya Altamirano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Altamirano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Ames
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Torin Antijunti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Antijunti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Boster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renee Meyocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debby Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Hyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi Hyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer McInnis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tasha McLemore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Will McLemore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Meyocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Madison Meyocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Meyocks
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Terminated: 11/28/2023
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/27 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Claudio Acosta, Gabriel Acosta, Jr, Gabriel Acosta, Marilena Acosta, Nicole Acosta, Alicya Altamirano, Anthony Altamirano, Kyle Ames, Torin Antijunti, Victoria Antijunti, Pamela Boster, Ronald Boster, Debby Brown, Mary Hayes, Richard Hayes, Brad Hyatt, Brandi Hyatt, Jennifer McInnis, Tasha McLemore, Will McLemore, Cody Meyocks, Madison Meyocks, Mark Meyocks, Renee Meyocks, Charlene Ostrom, Lance Ostrom, Jamie Parker, Landon Parker, Gerald Rafn, Jill Rafn, Jessica Richards, Darik Rochon, Sonia Serrano, Doug Simpson, Cory Slobig, Troy Slobig, Robert Smoot, Audomaro Valencia, Carrie Valencia, Evelyn Vandenheuvel, Richard Vandenheuvel, Jose Vargas, Juan Vargas, Jenna Vogel, Matthew Vogel, Justin Werst as to Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. Only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02775-RMG(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Sat 09/09 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 06/20 4:04 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Washington Eastern (associated as of 6/20/2023), 1:23-cv-03068, Nicole Acosta et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02775-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 06/20 3:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-03068. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Case closed. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, MDL Clerk. (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Patrick J. Lanciotti added for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | |
Reset Motion Hearing as to2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Patrick Lanciotti. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4294472.. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice . RESET TO CORRECT JUDGE. (BF, Paralegal) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Docket Annotation - Re Filing Error:3 Summons Issued as to All Named Defendants. ***Corrected PDF as to formatting error. (BM, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to All Named Defendants. SEE CORRECTED PDF AT ECF NO 4 . (BM, Case Administrator) Modified on 5/18/2023 as to corrected pdf, due to formatting error (BM, Case Administrator). [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Patrick Lanciotti. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4294472. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Bricklin, David) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4294465) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bricklin, David) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (BM, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 6/20/2023.] |