California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:23-mj-70340
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 21, 2023 12:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Juan Isidro Ortiz (1)
Represented By
James Thomas Reilly
Summit Defense
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maya Beth Karwande
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/21/2023 12:57 AM PDT
Thursday, March 23, 2023
Set Hearing as to Defendant Juan Isidro Ortiz: Initial Appearance set for 3/23/2023 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 Pls. See Redacted Version as dkt 7 ) SEALED COMPLAINT as to Juan Isidro Ortiz (1). (cfe, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/24/2023 (cfe, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal Documents by USA as to Juan Isidro Ortiz. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALING ORDER 2 as to Juan Isidro Ortiz (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/22/23. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 See Correct Pdf, as Attachment 1. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Initial Appearance as to Juan Isidro Ortiz held on 3/23/2023. The government moved to unseal the complaint. The Court ordered the complaint to be unsealed. Defendant shall file a financial affidavit. Jay Rorty shall be appointed as counsel and will appear on 3/28/2023 for ID Counsel.DDPA advised. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Attorney Appointment/ID of Counsel Hearing & Status Re: Detention set for 3/28/2023 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Plaintiff's Attorney: Maia Perez for Maya Karwande. Defendant's Attorney:Varell Fuller (Specially for Jay Rorty). Pretrial Officer: Anthony Granados. Liberty:12:45-12:53pm (08 mins). Defendant Present:Yes. Defendant in Custody:Yes. (cfe, COURT STAFF) (cfe, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/24/2023 (cfe, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/24/2023) Correct pdf.